Key 2 Freedom, LLC v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Key 2 Freedom, LLC
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv10547
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SECOND STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, (Response due by 6/30/2020). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, (Response due by 4/1/2020). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew J. Black appearing on behalf of Key 2 Freedom, LLC (Black, Andrew)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America from Livingston County Circuit Court, case number 2020-30615-CH. No Fee Required - US Government. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Ziedas, Tauras)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Key 2 Freedom, LLC v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Key 2 Freedom, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Tauras N. Ziedas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?