Livonia, City of v. Aquatic Renovation Systems, Inc. d/b/a Renosys Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Livonia, City of
Defendant: Aquatic Renovation Systems, Inc. d/b/a Renosys Corporation and Merchants Bonding Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv10737
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Stafford : Settlement Conference to be held in September 2020. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 12/20/2020, Expert Discovery due by 2/20/2021, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 3/22/2021, Final Settlement Conference set for 7/19/2021 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith, Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/9/2021 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith, and Jury Trial set for 8/23/2021 at 08:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Refer to image for additional dates) (Sandusky, K)
April 20, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 4/20/2020. (Sandusky, K)
April 17, 2020 Filing 12 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Neville, Leo)
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses City of Livonia's Answer to Counter-Complaint by Livonia, City of. (Neville, Leo)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Regarding Telephonic Scheduling Conference ( TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 4/20/2020 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith). Attorney for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and then include the Court when all parties are available by calling 313/234-5240. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
March 27, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aquatic Renovation Systems, Inc. d/b/a Renosys Corporation. (Mitchell, John)
March 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Merchants Bonding Company Statement of Disclosure of Corp Affiliations and Financial Interest (Stapleton, William)
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 COUNTERCLAIM filed by Aquatic Renovation Systems, Inc. d/b/a Renosys Corporation against Aquatic Renovation Systems, Inc. d/b/a Renosys Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Stapleton, William)
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Merchants Bonding Company. (Stapleton, William)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Aquatic Renovation Systems, Inc. d/b/a Renosys Corporation. (Mitchell, John)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Stapleton on behalf of Aquatic Renovation Systems, Inc. d/b/a Renosys Corporation, Merchants Bonding Company. (Stapleton, William)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Regarding Removal. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
March 19, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aquatic Renovation Systems, Inc. d/b/a Renosys Corporation from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 20-002246-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7691161 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Mitchell, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Livonia, City of v. Aquatic Renovation Systems, Inc. d/b/a Renosys Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aquatic Renovation Systems, Inc. d/b/a Renosys Corporation
Represented By: John G. Mitchell
Represented By: William J. Stapleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merchants Bonding Company
Represented By: William J. Stapleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Livonia, City of
Represented By: Paul Bernier
Represented By: Leo D. Neville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?