Esshaki v. Whitmer et al
Plaintiff: Eric Esshaki
Defendant: Jocelyn Benson, Gretchen Whitmer, Jonathan Brater and Armand Velardo
Petitioner: Brenda K. Sanders
Amicus Curiae: Daniel Finley, Whittney Williams, Michigan Republican Party, Deana Beard and American Civil Liberties Union of Michigan
Intervenor Plaintiff: Ms. Shakira L Hawkins
Intervenor: Lynn M. Maison and Matt Savich
Case Number: 2:2020cv10831
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 JUDGMENT re #83 . Judgment in the amount of $ 15,423.25. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #75 Motion for Attorney Fees for Plaintiff-Intervenor Shakira Hawkins. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 JUDGMENT re #81 . Judgment in the amount of $ 8249.18. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #73 Motion for Attorney Fees for Plaintiff-Intervenor Matt Savich. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Eric Esshaki re #66 Order on Motion to Intervene (SSch)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REPLY to Response re #73 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum of Law filed by Matt Savich. (Cafferty, Michael)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #75 MOTION for Attorney Fees, #73 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum of Law (AChu)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 RESPONSE to #75 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Gretchen Whitmer. (Meingast, Heather)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to Respond re #75 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Shakira L Hawkins. Response due by 10/7/2020 Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 RESPONSE to #73 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum of Law filed by Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Gretchen Whitmer. (Meingast, Heather)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Shakira L Hawkins. (Sahu, Saura)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 BILL OF COSTS by Matt Savich (Cafferty, Michael)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum of Law by Matt Savich. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits INDEX OF EXHIBITS, #2 Exhibit EX 1 - BILL OF COSTS, #3 Exhibit EX 2 - AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY MICHAEL S CAFFERTY WITH BILLING STATEMENT AND 2017 STATE BAR ECONOMIC SURVEY) (Cafferty, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re #24 Notice of Appeal filed by Jonathan Brater, Jocelyn Benson, Gretchen Whitmer [Appeal Case Number 20-1336] (SKra)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re Text-Only Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, filed by Shakira L Hawkins. (Sahu, Saura)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Matt Savich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Response to Motion to Dismiss) (Cafferty, Michael)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: On August 4, 2020, Michigan's primary election took place. As a result of this proceeding, Plaintiffs have obtained the injunctive relief each sought. Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by Monday, August 24, 2020 why this case should not be dismissed as moot. (Response due by 8/24/2020) Issued by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Notice to Parties Regarding Consolidated Case: Order of consolidation entered on *08/13/20*. Designated lead case number is *20-10831*. (DPer)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER consolidating cases 20-10831 and 20-11067. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (DPer)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DENYING #65 Motion to Intervene. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #66 Order on Motion to Intervene on Brenda K. Sanders at PO Box 14183, Detroit, MI 48214. (AChu)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 EMERGENCY MOTION to Intervene by Brenda K. Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Intervenor Complaint, #2 Application to Proceed without Prepaying Fees or Costs) (ATee)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING #51 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; GRANTING #58 Motion to Intervene; GRANTING #61 Motion to File Sur-Reply. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Amicus Curiae BRIEF by Armand Velardo (Velardo, Armand)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 SUR-REPLY re #51 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Gretchen Whitmer. (Meingast, Heather)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION Motion to File Sur-Reply re #51 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction by Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Gretchen Whitmer. (Meingast, Heather)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Joinder/Concurrence in by Lynn M. Maison RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR TRO - #51 (Kordenbrock, Jean)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 EXHIBIT A Verified Complaint re #58 MOTION emergency motion to intervene and brief in support MOTION to Intervene by Lynn M. Maison (Kordenbrock, Jean)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION emergency motion to intervene and brief in support, MOTION to Intervene by Lynn M. Maison. (Kordenbrock, Jean)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean E. Kordenbrock on behalf of Lynn M. Maison. (Kordenbrock, Jean)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REPLY to Response re #51 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by Shakira L Hawkins. (Sahu, Saura)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Terrence G. Berg: Motion Hearing held on 5/18/2020 re #51 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by Shakira L Hawkins. Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Linda Cavanagh) (AChu)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 RESPONSE to #51 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Gretchen Whitmer. (Meingast, Heather)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 RESPONSE to #51 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by Daniel Finley. (Finley, Daniel)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE OF HEARING on #51 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction. Response due by 5/15/2020, Reply due by 5/18/2020 12:00 noon, Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2020 03:00 PM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #47 Motion to Intervene. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction by Shakira L Hawkins. (Sahu, Saura)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 EXHIBIT A & B re #49 Supplemental Brief by Shakira L Hawkins (Sahu, Saura)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #47 Emergency MOTION to Intervene and Brief in Support, with Exh. A: [Proposed] Compl. in Intervention filed by Shakira L Hawkins. (Sahu, Saura)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: By 5:00 PM on 5/12/2020, proposed intervenor Shakira L. Hawkins shall file supplemental briefing addressing: (i) whether she has standing to bring her claim given that her name is currently on the ballot, and (ii) whether she personally made any expenditures as of March 10, 2020 that would have necessitated establishment of a candidate committee under Michigan Election Law. See Mich. Comp. Laws 169.203(1)(c). Issued by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE by Shakira L Hawkins re #47 Emergency MOTION to Intervene and Brief in Support, with Exh. A: [Proposed] Compl. in Intervention UPDATE RE CONCURRENCE AS TO PLAINTIFF ESSHAKI (Sahu, Saura)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Emergency MOTION to Intervene and Brief in Support, with Exh. A: [Proposed] Compl. in Intervention by Shakira L Hawkins. (Sahu, Saura)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles R. Spies on behalf of Michigan Republican Party. (Spies, Charles)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 RESPONSE to #38 Defendants Proposed Order by Deana Beard. (AChu)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Amicus Curiae BRIEF by Michigan Republican Party (Avers, Robert)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re Text-Only Order,,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, #38 Statement RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS PROPOSED ACCOMMODATIONS filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Witucki Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - Hawkins Declaration) (Korobkin, Daniel)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Michigan Republican Party. (Avers, Robert)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #13 Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Daniel Finley. (Finley, Daniel)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ERRATA Sheet re: #38 Statement filed by Jonathan Brater, Jocelyn Benson, Gretchen Whitmer. by Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Gretchen Whitmer (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Errata - Page 5) (Meingast, Heather)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING #41 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Michigan Republican Party. Issued by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Terrence G. Berg: Hearing held re #45 ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit on 5/7/2020. (Court Reporter: Linda Cavanagh) (AChu)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STATEMENT of Proposed Amendment to April 20, 2020 Order Granting Preliminary Injunction by Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Gretchen Whitmer (Meingast, Heather)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: In light of the recent ruling by the 6th Circuit Court of Appeals, Defendants are directed to submit proposed reasonable accommodations by 5:00 p.m. on 5/6/2020. Any objections from Plaintiffs shall be filed on or before noon on 5/7/2020. The Court will hold a hearing via videoconference on 5/7/2020 at 3:00 p.m. Set Hearings: (Response due by 5/6/2020 05:00 p.m., Objections due by 12:00 noon on 5/7/2020, Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2020 03:00 PM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg. Issued by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re #24 Notice of Appeal filed by Jonathan Brater, Jocelyn Benson, Gretchen Whitmer [Appeal Case Number 20-1336] (SKra)
April 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DENYING #26 Defendants' Rule 60(b) Motion and Request for Stay Pending Appeal. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Brief in RESPONSE to #26 Defendant's Emergency Motion Under Rule 60(B) for Limited Relief from the Court's Order Granting a Preliminary Injunction, or Alternatively for a Stay Pending Emergency Appeal filed by Deana Beard. (AChu)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 DECLARATION by Dennis Donahue filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Michigan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Dennis Donahue) (Korobkin, Daniel)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #26 Emergency MOTION Motion Under Rule 60(B) for Limited Relief from the Court's Order Granting a Preliminary Injunction, or Alternatively for a Stay Pending Emergency Appeal re #23 Order on Motion for TRO filed by Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Gretchen Whitmer. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A. Declaration of Melissa Malerman) (Meingast, Heather)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DECLARATION filed by Eric Esshaki (Rohl, Gregory)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TRANSCRIPT of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order held on 04/15/2020. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda M. Cavanagh) (Number of Pages: 45) (Appeal Purposes) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 5/15/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/26/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2020. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Cavanagh, Linda)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Terrence G. Berg: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 4/23/2020 (Court Reporter: Linda Cavanagh) (AChu)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DECLARATION by Matt Savich filed by Matt Savich (Cafferty, Michael)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Eric Steven Esshaki appearing on behalf of Eric Esshaki (Esshaki, Eric)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING: Miscellaneous Hearing set for 4/23/2020 11:00 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Miscellaneous Hearing set for 4/23/2020 11:00 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Defendants' Brief in Support of Emergency Motion under Rule 60(B) for Limited Relief from the Court's Order Granting a Preliminary Injunction, or Alternatively for a Stay Pending Emergency Appeal by Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Gretchen Whitmer. (Meingast, Heather)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Emergency MOTION Motion Under Rule 60(B) for Limited Relief from the Court's Order Granting a Preliminary Injunction, or Alternatively for a Stay Pending Emergency Appeal re #23 Order on Motion for TRO by Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Gretchen Whitmer. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A. Declaration of Melissa Malerman) (Meingast, Heather)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING #27 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Issued by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Certificate of Service re #24 Notice of Appeal. (SKra)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Jocelyn Benson, Gretchen Whitmer, Jonathan Brater re #23 Order on Motion for TRO. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7753388 - Fee: $ 505 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Meingast, Heather)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING Motions to File Amicus Curiae Briefs; GRANTING AND DENYING Motions to Intervene. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Amicus Curiae BRIEF by Whittney Williams (Kordenbrock, Jean)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief by Whittney Williams. (Kordenbrock, Jean)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean E. Kordenbrock on behalf of Whittney Williams. (Kordenbrock, Jean)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Intervenor's Complaint for Emergency Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by Kyle Kopitke. (AChu)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 EMERGENCY MOTION for Joinder and/or Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Deana Beard. (AChu)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Steinberg on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of Michigan. (Steinberg, Michael)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Terrence G. Berg: Motion Hearing held on 4/15/2020 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Eric Esshaki. Disposition: Motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Linda Cavanagh) (AChu)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Amicus Curiae BRIEF by American Civil Liberties Union of Michigan (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Bannister Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - Faulkner for Virginia v. Virginia Department of Elections) (Korobkin, Daniel)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by American Civil Liberties Union of Michigan. (Korobkin, Daniel)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Amicus Curiae BRIEF by Daniel Finley (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3) (Finley, Daniel)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Daniel P. Finley appearing on behalf of Daniel Finley Amicus Curiae (Finley, Daniel)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Intervene by Matt Savich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Intervening Complaint) (Cafferty, Michael)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPLY to Response re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Eric Esshaki. (Rohl, Gregory)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Terrence G. Berg: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 4/13/2020 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (AChu)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING BY VIDEOCONFERENCE on #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Reply due by 4/14/2020, Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Miscellaneous Hearing set for 4/13/2020 10:30 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Intervene for leave to file Amicus Curiae Brief under Fed. R. Civ. P. 29 and 32 by Daniel Finley. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Amicus Curiae Brief, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1) (Finley, Daniel)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RESPONSE to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Gretchen Whitmer. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1. Chart) (Meingast, Heather)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING #7 MOTION to Intervene. Any amicus curiae brief by movant shall be filed by 4/14/20. Issued by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Heather S. Meingast appearing on behalf of Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Gretchen Whitmer (Meingast, Heather)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Miscellaneous Hearing set for 4/1/2020 01:30 PM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Gretchen Whitmer* (SKra)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Terrence G. Berg: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 4/1/2020 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (AChu)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Eric Esshaki. (Rohl, Gregory)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Eric Esshaki against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7713384 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Lenawee. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Rohl, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Esshaki v. Whitmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jocelyn Benson
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Brater
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armand Velardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Esshaki
Represented By: Gregory J. Rohl
Represented By: Eric Steven Esshaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Daniel Finley
Represented By: Daniel P. Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Whittney Williams
Represented By: Jean E. Kordenbrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michigan Republican Party
Represented By: Charles R. Spies
Represented By: Robert L. Avers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Deana Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Civil Liberties Union of Michigan
Represented By: Daniel S. Korobkin
Represented By: Michael J. Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Ms. Shakira L Hawkins
Represented By: Saura J. Sahu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Lynn M. Maison
Represented By: Jean E. Kordenbrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Matt Savich
Represented By: Michael S. Cafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brenda K. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?