Doerr v. Real Estate One Inc. DBA Max Broock Realtors et al
Plaintiff: Sean Doerr
Defendant: Isnije Jusufi and Real Estate One Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv10840
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER (Responsive Pleading due by 7/6/2020) - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Anthony A. Randazzo appearing on behalf of Real Estate One Inc. (Randazzo, Anthony)
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Real Estate One Inc. waiver sent on 4/2/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Dunne, Joseph)
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Sean Doerr (Dunne, Joseph)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph F. Yamin appearing on behalf of Sean Doerr (Yamin, Joseph)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Secure Local Counsel by April 24, 2020 - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Isnije Jusufi* (DPer)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Real Estate One Inc.* (DPer)
April 1, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 Copyright Report Sent To Washington (Dunne, Joseph)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sean Doerr against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7715580 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2- Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters) (Dunne, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doerr v. Real Estate One Inc. DBA Max Broock Realtors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isnije Jusufi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Estate One Inc.
Represented By: Anthony A. Randazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Doerr
Represented By: Joseph A. Dunne
Represented By: Joseph F. Yamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?