HAMANN et al v. CHARTER TOWNSHIP OF VAN BUREN et al
Plaintiff: JOHN HAMANN, RONALD HAMANN and LISA HAPMAN
Defendant: Benjamin Garrison, BRIAN ZINSER, ABRAHAM HUGHES, MATTHEW RASCHKE, City of Livonia, City of Wayne, CHARTER TOWNSHIP OF CANTON, ROBERT LOWES and CHARTER TOWNSHIP OF VAN BUREN
Case Number: 2:2020cv10849
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Michael J Hluchaniuk
Referring Judge: David M Lawson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James R. Acho appearing on behalf of CHARTER TOWNSHIP OF VAN BUREN, MATTHEW RASCHKE (Acho, James)
May 27, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Benjamin Garrison served on 5/26/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Cabot, Shawn)
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael A. Knoblock appearing on behalf of City of Wayne, ABRAHAM HUGHES (Knoblock, Michael)
May 27, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: T. Joseph Seward appearing on behalf of City of Wayne, ABRAHAM HUGHES (Seward, T.)
May 26, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. City of Livonia served on 5/22/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. (Cabot, Shawn)
May 26, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. ROBERT LOWES served on 5/22/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. (Cabot, Shawn)
May 19, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. ABRAHAM HUGHES served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Cabot, Shawn)
May 19, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. CHARTER TOWNSHIP OF CANTON served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Cabot, Shawn)
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. MATTHEW RASCHKE served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Cabot, Shawn)
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. CHARTER TOWNSHIP OF VAN BUREN served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Cabot, Shawn)
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. City of Wayne served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Cabot, Shawn)
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. BRIAN ZINSER served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Cabot, Shawn)
April 1, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *CHARTER TOWNSHIP OF CANTON, CHARTER TOWNSHIP OF VAN BUREN, City of Livonia, City of Wayne, Benjamin Garrison, ABRAHAM HUGHES, ROBERT LOWES, MATTHEW RASCHKE, BRIAN ZINSER* (DAll)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by LISA HAPMAN, JOHN HAMANN, RONALD HAMANN against CHARTER TOWNSHIP OF CANTON, CHARTER TOWNSHIP OF VAN BUREN, City of Livonia, City of Wayne, Benjamin Garrison, ABRAHAM HUGHES, ROBERT LOWES, MATTHEW RASCHKE, BRIAN ZINSER with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7716669 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Cabot, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAMANN et al v. CHARTER TOWNSHIP OF VAN BUREN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN ZINSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABRAHAM HUGHES
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW RASCHKE
Represented By: James R. Acho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Livonia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Wayne
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARTER TOWNSHIP OF CANTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT LOWES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARTER TOWNSHIP OF VAN BUREN
Represented By: James R. Acho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN HAMANN
Represented By: Shawn C. Cabot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD HAMANN
Represented By: Shawn C. Cabot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA HAPMAN
Represented By: Shawn C. Cabot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?