Foltman v. Lake Michigan Credit Union et al
Plaintiff: Samantha Foltman
Defendant: Sara Kemperman, Craig Sapelak, Lake Michigan Credit Union, Alex Clayson and Becky Beld
Case Number: 2:2020cv10884
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from Wayne County Circuit Court of receipt of #5 Notice of remand. (DPer)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE remanding case to WAYNE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT. (DPer)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATED ORDER REMANDING CASE to Wayne County Circuit Court. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (DPer)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 4/23/2020 Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C. Waslawski on behalf of All Defendants. (Waslawski, Daniel)
April 7, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lake Michigan Credit Union from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 19-017172-CD. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7726104 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summonses and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 -Declaration of Nora Swart) (Rubin, Allan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foltman v. Lake Michigan Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Kemperman
Represented By: Daniel C. Waslawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Sapelak
Represented By: Daniel C. Waslawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Michigan Credit Union
Represented By: Allan S. Rubin
Represented By: Daniel C. Waslawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Clayson
Represented By: Daniel C. Waslawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky Beld
Represented By: Daniel C. Waslawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Foltman
Represented By: Thomas R. Warnicke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?