Chambers v. Bouchard et al
Plaintiff: Malachi Chambers
Defendant: Oakland County, Mr. Michael Bouchard and Mr. Curtis D. Childs
Case Number: 2:2020cv10916
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Michael J Hluchaniuk
Referring Judge: Denise Page Hood
2 Judge: Patricia T Morris
3 Judge: Linda V Parker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2020 Filing 32 SEALED EXHIBIT #1 by All Plaintiffs. (MacLean, Douglas)
June 7, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #30 MOTION Release Plaintiff from Jail (MacLean, Douglas)
June 7, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION Release Plaintiff from Jail by All Plaintiffs. (MacLean, Douglas)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #28 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
May 22, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE to #27 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), #28 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Response Brief Re First Amended Complaint filed by Malachi Chambers. (MacLean, Douglas)
May 22, 2020 Filing 28 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Response Brief by Malachi Chambers. (MacLean, Douglas)
May 13, 2020 Filing 27 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by All Defendants. (Menna, Peter)
May 5, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter L. Menna on behalf of Curtis D. Childs. (Menna, Peter)
April 30, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Corrected Response Brief filed by Malachi Chambers. (MacLean, Douglas)
April 30, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS Issued for *Curtis D. Childs* (DAll)
April 30, 2020 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Curtis D. Childs. (Leaf, Martin)
April 30, 2020 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT And Petition For Habeas Corpus filed by Malachi Chambers against All Defendants. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Leaf, Martin)
April 28, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE by Malachi Chambers re #19 Response to Motion Corrected Response and Amended Complaint (MacLean, Douglas)
April 28, 2020 Filing 21 SEALED EXHIBIT 1 by Malachi Chambers. (MacLean, Douglas)
April 28, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by Malachi Chambers Records Under Seal (MacLean, Douglas)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
April 27, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Malachi Chambers. (Leaf, Martin)
April 27, 2020 Filing 18 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs. (MacLean, Douglas)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Briefing on the #9 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is stayed pending a decision on the pending #8 MOTION to Dismiss. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
April 23, 2020 Filing 17 BRIEFING SCHEDULE as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (Response due by 4/27/2020). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
April 23, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Linda V. Parker: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/23/2020. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (RLou)
April 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 4/23/2020 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Linda V. Parker (RLou)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Denise Page Hood and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris to District Judge Linda V. Parker and Magistrate Judge Michael J. Hluchaniuk. (NAhm)
April 20, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing on May 27, 2020 is Cancelled. (LSau)
April 20, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), #9 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Response due by 5/4/2020 Reply due by 5/11/2020 Motion Hearing set for 5/27/2020 10:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Notice of Setting Hearing Date on Motion for Preliminary Injunction #10 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
April 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #12 Notice (Other) of Corrected Notice of Opinion and Order Affecting Case (MacLean, Douglas)
April 19, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Malachi Chambers of Opinion and Order Affecting Case (Leaf, Martin)
April 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF HEARING on #8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2020 04:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
April 17, 2020 Filing 10 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Malachi Chambers. (Leaf, Martin)
April 17, 2020 Filing 9 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Malachi Chambers. (Leaf, Martin)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by All Defendants. (Menna, Peter)
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Klemptner on behalf of All Defendants. (Klemptner, Daniel)
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter L. Menna on behalf of All Defendants. (Menna, Peter)
April 11, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Douglas K. MacLean appearing on behalf of Malachi Chambers (MacLean, Douglas)
April 11, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Michael Bouchard served on 4/10/2020, answer due 5/1/2020. (MacLean, Douglas)
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Oakland County* (DAll)
April 10, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Michael Bouchard* (DAll)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Malachi Chambers against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7732786 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Leaf, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. Bouchard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland County
Represented By: Peter L. Menna
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Michael Bouchard
Represented By: Peter L. Menna
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Curtis D. Childs
Represented By: Peter L. Menna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malachi Chambers
Represented By: Martin H. Leaf
Represented By: Douglas K. MacLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?