Jack Doheny Companies, Incorporated v. Vactor Manufacturing Company
Plaintiff: Jack Doheny Companies, Incorporated
Defendant: Vactor Manufacturing Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv10937
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Anthony P Patti
Referring Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Vactor Manufacturing Company served on 5/29/2020, answer due 6/19/2020. (Wais, Michael)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Elgin Sweeper Company served on 5/27/2020, answer due 6/17/2020. (Wais, Michael)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Elgin Sweeper Company* (SOso)
May 8, 2020 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Elgin Sweeper Company. (Wais, Michael)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jack Doheny Companies, Incorporated against Vactor Manufacturing Company, Elgin Sweeper Company. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - "Guzzler" Brand Purchase Orders, #3 Exhibit B - Examples of Written Acknowledgments, #4 Exhibit C - "Vactor" and "Elgin" Brand Purchase Orders, #5 Exhibit D - Letter to Federal Signal, April 17, 2020) (Wais, Michael)
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Jack Doheny Companies, Incorporated (Wais, Michael)
April 15, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Vactor Manufacturing Company* (NAhm)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan F. Karmo on behalf of Jack Doheny Companies, Incorporated. (Karmo, Jonathan)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jack Doheny Companies, Incorporated against Vactor Manufacturing Company with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7742659 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Purchase Orders, #3 Exhibit B - Examples of Written Acknowledgments) (Wais, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jack Doheny Companies, Incorporated v. Vactor Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vactor Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Doheny Companies, Incorporated
Represented By: Michael F. Wais
Represented By: Jonathan F. Karmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?