Quicken Loans Inc. v. Success Funding et al
Plaintiff: Quicken Loans Inc.
Defendant: Success Funding and Alex A. Dadourian
Case Number: 2:2020cv10944
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott W. Kraemer on behalf of All Defendants. (Kraemer, Scott)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Satisfying Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Quicken Loans Inc.. (Murray, Thomas)
April 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Show Cause Show Cause Response due by 4/24/2020 Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Success Funding* (LGra)
April 17, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Alex A. Dadourian* (LGra)
April 17, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Quicken Loans Inc. against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7745373 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Los Angeles. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Broker Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Chart of fraudulent loans) (Murray, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quicken Loans Inc. v. Success Funding et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Success Funding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex A. Dadourian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quicken Loans Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?