Freeplay Music LLC v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Freeplay Music LLC
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv10948
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 Amended Complaint, Ford Motor Company answer due 8/3/2020. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
June 5, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Amended Complaint, by Ford Motor Company. (Cherry, Jared)
May 15, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs (Hertz, Howard)
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED #8 Attorney Appearance by All Plaintiffs (Busch, Richard)
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Richard S. Busch appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Busch, Richard)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration of Works, #2 Exhibit Infringing Uses, #3 Exhibit Infringing Uses Discovered After Notice, #4 Exhibit Infringing Uses Included in Notice) (Hertz, Howard)
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Ford Motor Company* (DAll)
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard Hertz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hertz, Howard)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs (Bellanca, Joseph)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT REPORT by All Plaintiffs (Bellanca, Joseph)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Bellanca on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Bellanca, Joseph)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Freeplay Music LLC against Ford Motor Company with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7746022 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: OUT OF STATE - County Where Action Arose: WAYNE - County of 1st Defendant: WAYNE. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Registered Works, #2 Exhibit B - List of Infringing Uses, #3 Exhibit C - List of Infringing Uses Discovered After Notice, #4 Exhibit D - Infringing Uses Included in Notice) (Bellanca, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeplay Music LLC v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freeplay Music LLC
Represented By: Joseph A. Bellanca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?