Gardner v. Mikat
Plaintiff: Eric Gardner
Defendant: Mikat
Case Number: 2:2020cv10992
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Patricia T Morris
Referring Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Opinion and Order Dismissing Case on Eric Gardner Pris. No. 287557, Carson City (MSP), 10274 Boyer Rd. Carson City, MI 48811-9746. (DPar)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION and ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Eric Gardner. (SOso)
April 27, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on Eric Gardner Pris. No. 287557, Carson City (MSP), 10274 Boyer Rd. Carson City, MI 48811. (DPar)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Denying #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, (Filing Fee due 5/15/2020). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
April 22, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Western District of Michigan. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 Docket Sheet from Michigan Western; Case Number 1:20-cv-00305.
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Eastern District of Michigan; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal) [Transferred from miwd on 4/22/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (ns) [Transferred from miwd on 4/22/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDCOMPLAINT with magistrate referral against Unknown Mikat filed by Eric Andrew Gardner #287557 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (ns)[Transferred from Michigan Western; Case Number 1:20-cv-00305.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. Mikat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?