Bossart et al v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Christa Rochford, Phillip Mirenda, Joseph Bossart, Steven M. Chookazian, Troy Williams, Derrol Turner, Eric Czajka and Ronnie E. Barker
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv11057
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the deadline for defendant to respond to the #1 complaint and setting briefing schedule: (Response due by 7/10/2020) Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)(Refer to image for additional deadlines)
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. General Motors LLC served on 5/4/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Miller, E.)
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A. Lienhardt on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Lienhardt, Dennis)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William Kalas on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Kalas, William)
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily E. Hughes on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hughes, Emily)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon S. Almonrode on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Almonrode, Sharon)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *General Motors LLC* (NAhm)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against General Motors LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7773369 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Out of State - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-2017 Car and Driver Review, #3 Exhibit B-C7 Bent/Cracked Wheels) (Miller, E.)
April 30, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bossart et al v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christa Rochford
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Mirenda
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bossart
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven M. Chookazian
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Williams
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrol Turner
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Czajka
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie E. Barker
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?