Marks et al v. Schafer and Weiner, PLLC et al
Plaintiff: TMT, Inc. and J. Anthony Marks
Defendant: John J. Stockdale, Brendan G. Best, Leon N. Mayer, Schafer and Weiner, PLLC and Howard M. Borin
Case Number: 2:2020cv11059
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
May 11, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. John J. Stockdale waiver sent on 5/8/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (Urtz, Kevin)
May 11, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Howard M. Borin waiver sent on 5/8/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (Urtz, Kevin)
May 11, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Brendan G. Best waiver sent on 5/8/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (Urtz, Kevin)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Leon N. Mayer waiver sent on 5/8/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (Urtz, Kevin)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Schafer and Weiner, PLLC waiver sent on 5/8/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (Urtz, Kevin)
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by TMT, Inc. (Urtz, Kevin)
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Annual Report and Annual Statement, #2 Exhibit B - Bankruptcy Filings, #3 Exhibit C - IRS Proof of Claim 7-4, #4 Exhibit D - 9/25/13 Letter from Defendants to IRS) (Urtz, Kevin)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Regarding Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
May 1, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7774283 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out fo State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Bankruptcy Filings, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - IRS Proof of Claim 7-4, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - 9/25/13 Letter from Defendants to IRS) (Urtz, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marks et al v. Schafer and Weiner, PLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TMT, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin C. Urtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Anthony Marks
Represented By: Kevin C. Urtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Stockdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendan G. Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon N. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schafer and Weiner, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard M. Borin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?