Frye v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mary Frye
Defendant: U.S. Bank, NA as Trustee for 2007 GSAMP Trust 2007-NC1 Mortgage Pass Through Certificates Series 2007-NC1, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, NewRez, LLC and PHH Mortgage Services a/k/a PHH Services Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv11385
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 TEXT-NOTICE of Correction re #8 Protective Order. PLEASE DISREGARD - THIS DOCUMENT WAS MEANT FOR ANOTHER CASE. (MLan)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 *PLEASE DISREGARD - THIS ORDER WAS MEANT FOR ANOTHER CASE* QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan) Modified on 7/7/2020 (MLan). *PLEASE DISREGARD - THIS ORDER WAS MEANT FOR ANOTHER CASE*
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SECOND STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Response to #1 Complaint: Response due by 8/10/2020. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATED ORDER Requiring Extending Time for Response to #1 Complaint. Response due by 7/10/2020. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by U.S. Bank, NA as Trustee for 2007 GSAMP Trust 2007-NC1 Mortgage Pass Through Certificates Series 2007-NC1 (Ramin, Nasseem)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by NewRez, LLC (Ramin, Nasseem)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by PHH Mortgage Services a/k/a PHH Services Corporation (Ramin, Nasseem)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas M. Schehr appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Schehr, Thomas)
May 29, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Circuit Court for the County of Macomb, case number 2020-001682-CH. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7832400 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Mortgage) (Ramin, Nasseem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frye v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, NA as Trustee for 2007 GSAMP Trust 2007-NC1 Mortgage Pass Through Certificates Series 2007-NC1
Represented By: Nasseem S. Ramin
Represented By: Thomas M. Schehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Nasseem S. Ramin
Represented By: Thomas M. Schehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez, LLC
Represented By: Nasseem S. Ramin
Represented By: Thomas M. Schehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Services a/k/a PHH Services Corporation
Represented By: Nasseem S. Ramin
Represented By: Thomas M. Schehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Frye
Represented By: Vanessa G. Fluker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?