Grow Michigan, LLC v. LT Lender, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Grow Michigan, LLC
Defendant: John Reinhardt, Robert Drake, Paul Shamo, Robert Causley, Bruce Campbell, Jerry Reinhardt and LT Lender, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Damian Kassab
3Rd Party Defendant: Patrick O'Keefe
Case Number: 2:2020cv11391
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon R. Steiger on behalf of Patrick O'Keefe. (Steiger, Jon)
July 29, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Howard W. Burdett, Jr appearing on behalf of Patrick O'Keefe (Burdett, Howard)
July 29, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Kory Mark Steen on behalf of Patrick O'Keefe. (Steen, Kory)
July 21, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Robert Causley served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (Burdett, Howard)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Filing Deadlines. Amended Complaint due by 7/31/2020, Responsive Pleading due by 8/21/2020. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon R. Steiger on behalf of Grow Michigan, LLC. (Steiger, Jon)
July 20, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jewel M. Haji on behalf of Damian Kassab. (Haji, Jewel)
July 20, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Clark on behalf of Damian Kassab. (Clark, Andrew)
July 17, 2020 Filing 13 THIRD-PARTY SUMMONS Issued for *Patrick O'Keefe* (DWor)
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kory Mark Steen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Steen, Kory)
July 17, 2020 REQUEST for THIRD-PARTY SUMMONS for Patrick O'Keefe. (Gorga, Nicholas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT filed by Damian Kassab against Patrick O'Keefe (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Emails, #2 Exhibit 2 - Lightning Technologies Letter) (Gorga, Nicholas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Damian Kassab against Grow Michigan, LLC by Damian Kassab. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX 1, #2 Exhibit EX 2) (Burkholder, Evan)
July 8, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #8 Sealed Exhibit, by Bruce Campbell, LT Lender, LLC, Jerry Reinhardt, John Reinhardt (Bruinsma, James)
July 8, 2020 Filing 8 SEALED EXHIBIT B-3 re #4 MOTION for Order (RICO Case Statement Order and Extension of Time), Order on Motion to Seal, #5 MOTION to Seal #4 MOTION for Order (RICO Case Statement Order and Extension of Time) (Leave to file Exhibit B-3 only under seal) by Bruce Campbell, LT Lender, LLC, Jerry Reinhardt, John Reinhardt. (Bruinsma, James)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #5 Motion to Seal. Exhibit B-3 shall be filed under seal by the close of business on July 8, 2020. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Prerana R. Bacon appearing on behalf of Damian Kassab (Bacon, Prerana)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Evan A. Burkholder appearing on behalf of Damian Kassab (Burkholder, Evan)
July 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Seal #4 MOTION for Order (RICO Case Statement Order and Extension of Time) (Leave to file Exhibit B-3 only under seal) by Bruce Campbell, LT Lender, LLC, Jerry Reinhardt, John Reinhardt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B-3 Settlement Agreement (slip page)) (Bruinsma, James)
July 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Order (RICO Case Statement Order and Extension of Time) by Bruce Campbell, LT Lender, LLC, Jerry Reinhardt, John Reinhardt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Form of RICO Case Statement, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jerry Reinhart) (Bruinsma, James)
July 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Bruinsma on behalf of Bruce Campbell, LT Lender, LLC, Jerry Reinhardt, John Reinhardt. (Bruinsma, James)
June 1, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Bruce Campbell, Robert Causley, Robert Drake, Damian Kassab, LT Lender, LLC, Jerry Reinhardt, John Reinhardt, Paul Shamo* (SKra)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Grow Michigan, LLC against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7834165 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Oakland County Circuit Court, 2020-180564-CB, Judge James M. Alexander] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Shamo Line of Credit, #3 Exhibit B - Causley Line of Credit, #4 Exhibit C - Business Loan Agreement, #5 Exhibit D - Security Agreement, #6 Exhibit E - Intellectual Property Security Agreement, #7 Exhibit F - Demand Letters, #8 Exhibit G - Refusals to Fund) (Burdett, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grow Michigan, LLC v. LT Lender, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grow Michigan, LLC
Represented By: Howard W. Burdett, Jr.
Represented By: Kory Mark Steen
Represented By: Jon R. Steiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Reinhardt
Represented By: James R. Bruinsma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Shamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Causley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Campbell
Represented By: James R. Bruinsma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Reinhardt
Represented By: James R. Bruinsma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT Lender, LLC
Represented By: James R. Bruinsma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Damian Kassab
Represented By: Andrew Clark
Represented By: Jewel M. Haji
Represented By: Nicholas B Gorga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Patrick O'Keefe
Represented By: Howard W. Burdett, Jr.
Represented By: Kory Mark Steen
Represented By: Jon R. Steiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?