Amazon.com, Inc. v. Sendwell, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amazon.com, Inc.
Defendant: Lakeshore Development Grp LLC and Sendwell, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv11422
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED ORDER of DISMISSAL With Prejudice and Without Costs or Attorneys' Fees to Any Party. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
June 8, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Bernard A. Friedman to District Judge Linda V. Parker. (NAhm)
June 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter J. Piszczatowski on behalf of All Defendants. (Piszczatowski, Walter)
June 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Rex on behalf of All Defendants. (Rex, Michael)
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter J. Piszczatowski on behalf of All Defendants. (Piszczatowski, Walter)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Sendwell, Inc.* (LGra)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Lakeshore Development Grp LLC* (LGra)
June 2, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Amazon.com, Inc. (Lowe, Timothy)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 Report on the Filing REPORT by Amazon.com, Inc. (Lowe, Timothy)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Amazon.com, Inc. against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7837130 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: King - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Lowe, Timothy)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Lowe on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc.. (Lowe, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amazon.com, Inc. v. Sendwell, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeshore Development Grp LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Rex
Represented By: Walter J. Piszczatowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sendwell, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Rex
Represented By: Walter J. Piszczatowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?