Spine, PLLC, as Assignee of Kevin Van Hulle v. Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Spine, PLLC, as Assignee of Kevin Van Hulle
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv11445
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Spine, PLLC, as Assignee of Kevin Van Hulle (Haas, Justin)
July 27, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Spine, PLLC, as Assignee of Kevin Van Hulle (Haas, Justin)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gary N. Felty appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Felty, Gary)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY, PROTECTIVE, AND CLAWBACK ORDER. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/31/2021; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 5/31/2021; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2021 01:30 PM; Jury Trial set for 9/7/2021 09:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (Refer to image for additional dates) (JCur)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew H. DeNinno on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company. (DeNinno, Andrew)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacquelyn McEttrick on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS FOR SUBMISSION OF JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN (JCur)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Haas on behalf of Spine, PLLC, as Assignee of Kevin Van Hulle. (Haas, Justin)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Wisniewski, Michael)
June 3, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (KCas)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Insurance Company from 3rd Judicial Circuit Court, case number 20-003125-NF. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7841095 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs Summons and Complaint filed in Wayne County Circuit Court (3rd Judicial Circuit Court)) (Wisniewski, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spine, PLLC, as Assignee of Kevin Van Hulle v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spine, PLLC, as Assignee of Kevin Van Hulle
Represented By: Justin Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Wisniewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?