McCann et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James C McCann, Teresa Smith and Dwaine Smith
Defendant: Ethicon Inc and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 2:2020cv11483
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Withdraw Certain Attorneys as Counsel by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Williams, Michael)
July 1, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond I Foley on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Foley, Raymond)
June 30, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Dunbar on behalf of James C McCann, Dwaine Smith, Teresa Smith. (Dunbar, Aaron)
June 30, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A Gomez on behalf of James C McCann, Dwaine Smith, Teresa Smith. (Gomez, Christopher)
June 10, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Lena M. Gonzalez on behalf of Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Gonzalez, Lena)
June 10, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Williams on behalf of Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Williams, Michael)
June 5, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Southern District of West Virginia. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun)
June 5, 2020 Filing 15 Docket Sheet from West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:12-cv-05305.
June 5, 2020 Filing 14 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #80 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2039) Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2042) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2187) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 1 Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 2 Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2458) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 1 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 2 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 3 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3657) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3726) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 13 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #80 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2479) Pls Mot to Exclude Larry T. Sirls, II, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2480) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Larry T. Sirls, II, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2936) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Larry T. Sirls, II, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3638) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Larry T. Sirls, II, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3786) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Larry T. Sirls, II)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 12 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #80 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2003) Pls Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2004) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2175) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2240) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2469) Pls Amd Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2470) - Pls Mem in Support of Amd Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2618) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2925) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3615) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3714) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3828) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 11 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #80 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2063) Part 1 Pls Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2063) Part 2 Pls Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2069) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2184) Part 1 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2184) Part 2 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2255) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3598) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3730) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3817) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filers) (mkw).[Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 10 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #80 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2033) Pls Mot to Exclude Elaine Duncan, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2036) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Elaine Duncan, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2155) Part 1 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Elaine Duncan, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2155) Part 2 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Elaine Duncan, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2223) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Elaine Duncan, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3595) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Elaine Duncan, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3769) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Elaine Duncan, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3815) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Elaine Duncan)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #80 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 3- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 4- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 5- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 6- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 7- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 8- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 9- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 10- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 11- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 12 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 13- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 14- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2049) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2241) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2931) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (3579) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (3738) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #80 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2029) - Defs Mot to Exclude Michael Thomas Margolis, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2031) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Thomas Margolis, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2169) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Michael Thomas Margolis, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2212) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Thomas Margolis, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2832) - Defs Supp Mot to Exclude Michael Thomas Margolis and Notice of Adoption, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2833) Defs Mem in Support of Supp Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis and Notice of Adoption, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2904) Pls Resp to Defs Supp Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis and Notice of Adoption, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3603) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot and Replies in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Thomas Margolis, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3723) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Michael Thomas Margolis)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #80 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2200) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3630) - Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 4 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 5 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 6 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3855) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #80 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1978) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 3- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 4- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 5- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 6- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 7- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 8- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 9- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 10- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 11- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 12- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 13- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 14- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 15- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 16- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 17- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 18- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 19- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 20- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 21- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (1982) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #26 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 4 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #80 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3621) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3865) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #80 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2066) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 3- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 4- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 5- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 62- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2070) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 4 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 5 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 6 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 7 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 8 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 9 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 10 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 11 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 12 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 13 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 14 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 15 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (2251) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filers (mkw).[Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 06/05/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 06/04/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/22/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from wvsd on 6/5/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDSHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt # 0425-1984832. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tmh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:12-cv-05305.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCann et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C McCann
Represented By: Aaron Dunbar
Represented By: Christopher A Gomez
Represented By: Raymond I Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Smith
Represented By: Aaron Dunbar
Represented By: Christopher A Gomez
Represented By: Raymond I Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwaine Smith
Represented By: Aaron Dunbar
Represented By: Christopher A Gomez
Represented By: Raymond I Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc
Represented By: Jenny A. Covington
Represented By: Kim M. Schmid
Represented By: Lena M. Gonzalez
Represented By: Michael R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Jenny A. Covington
Represented By: Kim M. Schmid
Represented By: Lena M. Gonzalez
Represented By: Michael R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?