Leaf v. Nike Inc
Plaintiff: Martin H. Leaf
Defendant: Wieden & Kennedy, Nike Inc, Twitter, Inc., YouTube, Google LLC and Facebook Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv11491
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Stephen J Murphy
2 Judge: George Caram Steeh
3 Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 24 Ex Parte MOTION TO EXTEND re #23 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Brief by Martin H. Leaf. (MacLean, Douglas)
July 23, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss by Nike Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Unpublished Authorities, #3 Exhibit 2 - Deming COA Docket) (Ramin, Nasseem)
July 23, 2020 Filing 22 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Nike Inc (Ramin, Nasseem)
July 23, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Nasseem S. Ramin on behalf of Nike Inc. (Ramin, Nasseem)
July 23, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Schehr on behalf of Nike Inc. (Schehr, Thomas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Herman G. Petzold, III appearing on behalf of Martin H. Leaf (Petzold, Herman)
July 1, 2020 Filing 18 SEALED EXHIBIT for First Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (MacLean, Douglas)
July 1, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #16 Amended Complaint filing images under seal (MacLean, Douglas)
July 1, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Expanded Exhibits) (MacLean, Douglas)
June 28, 2020 Filing 15 SEALED EXHIBIT re #3 Amended Document by All Plaintiffs. (MacLean, Douglas)
June 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #3 Amended Document filing image under seal (MacLean, Douglas)
June 26, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Martin H. Leaf waiver sent on 6/12/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (MacLean, Douglas) Modified on 6/26/2020 (DWor). [WAIVER FOR FACEBOOK, INC.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued for *Facebook Inc., Google LLC, Nike Inc, Twitter, Inc., Wieden & Kennedy, YouTube* (DWor)
June 12, 2020 REQUEST for SUMMONS for All Defendants. (MacLean, Douglas)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge George Caram Steeh and Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen to District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm)
June 8, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Douglas K. MacLean appearing on behalf of Martin H. Leaf (MacLean, Douglas)
June 8, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued for *YouTube* (DWor)
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued for *Wieden & Kennedy* (DWor)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for *Twitter, Inc.* (DWor)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Google LLC* (DWor)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Nike Inc* (DWor)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Facebook Inc.* (DWor)
June 7, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED #1 Complaint,, by Martin H. Leaf Corrected Complaint Wrong PDF Filed (Leaf, Martin)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin H. Leaf on behalf of Martin H. Leaf. (Leaf, Martin)
June 5, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiff Martin H. Leaf, Defendants Twitter, Inc., Wieden & Kennedy, Facebook Inc., Google LLC, YouTube. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #1 Complaint,, Plaintiff requests summons issued. (MacLean, Douglas)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Rqst for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief- Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7847755 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Washington. [Previously dismissed case: Eastern District of Michigan, 218-cv-13406, Judge Stephen Murphy] [Possible companion case(s): None] (MacLean, Douglas) Modified on 6/8/2020 (SKra).[COMPLAINT FILED BY ALL PLAINTIFFS AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leaf v. Nike Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wieden & Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nike Inc
Represented By: Thomas M. Schehr
Represented By: Nasseem S. Ramin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin H. Leaf
Represented By: Martin H. Leaf
Represented By: Douglas K. MacLean
Represented By: Herman G. Petzold, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?