Randick et al v. Sawhill et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Aguirre, Michael Randick and Wayne Coffell
Defendant: James Buzzie, Chris Vlk and Richard J. Sawhill
Case Number: 2:2020cv11793
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Substitution of Attorneys. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Striking #10 Stipulation. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 [STRICKEN] STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel by All Plaintiffs (Matta, Steven) Modified on 8/20/2020 (RLou).
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Ankers, Gary)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C. Ankers on behalf of All Defendants. (Ankers, Gary)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. James Buzzie served on 8/2/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Henzi, Matthew)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Richard J. Sawhill served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. (Henzi, Matthew)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Chris Vlk served on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. (Henzi, Matthew)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Chris Vlk* (DWor)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Richard J. Sawhill* (DWor)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *James Buzzie* (DWor)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against James Buzzie, Richard J. Sawhill, Chris Vlk. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7899958 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pension Fund's Trust Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defined Contribution Pension Fund's Trust Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Health Fund's Trust Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Vacation Fund's Trust Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Training Fund's Trust Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 - Fee Arbitration Transcript, #7 Exhibit 7 - Cumming's Engagement Letter, #8 Exhibit 8 - Response Brief, #9 Exhibit 9 - AsherKelly Legal Services Agreement, #10 Exhibit 10 - May 11, 2020 Motion, #11 Exhibit 11 - May 12, 2020 Motion, #12 Exhibit 12 - May 15, 2020 Deadlock, #13 Exhibit 13 - June 10, 2020 Motions, #14 Exhibit 14 - June 22, 2020 Correspondence) (Henzi, Matthew)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randick et al v. Sawhill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Buzzie
Represented By: Gary C. Ankers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Vlk
Represented By: Gary C. Ankers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Sawhill
Represented By: Gary C. Ankers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Aguirre
Represented By: Matthew I. Henzi
Represented By: Steven A. Matta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Randick
Represented By: Matthew I. Henzi
Represented By: Steven A. Matta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Coffell
Represented By: Matthew I. Henzi
Represented By: Steven A. Matta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?