State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Martin et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Marc Martin, Shaleta Beasley and Ladonna Moore
Case Number: 2:2020cv11873
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: George Caram Steeh
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand AMENDED, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Shaleta Beasley against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company by Shaleta Beasley. (Chacko, Stephen)
September 4, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses (CORRECTED), ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand (CORRECTED), COUNTERCLAIM filed by Shaleta Beasley against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company by Shaleta Beasley. (Chacko, Stephen)
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Shaleta Beasley against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company by Shaleta Beasley. (Chacko, Stephen)
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Jacob Chacko on behalf of Shaleta Beasley. (Chacko, Stephen)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mohamed Adib Nehme on behalf of Marc Martin. (Nehme, Mohamed)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kassem M. Dakhlallah on behalf of Marc Martin. (Dakhlallah, Kassem)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ladonna Moore served on 8/1/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Wille, Amy)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Shaleta Beasley served on 7/25/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Wille, Amy)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Amy L. Wille appearing on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Wille, Amy)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Berlin, Cary)
July 9, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Ladonna Moore* (DWor)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Marc Martin* (DWor)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Shaleta Beasley* (DWor)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7916128 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Beasley POL, #2 Exhibit Moore POL, #3 Exhibit Beasley Rental Dwelling Policy, #4 Exhibit Beasley/Moore Lease, #5 Exhibit Moore Policy, #6 Exhibit Beasley EUO Demand, #7 Exhibit Moore EUO Demand) (Berlin, Cary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Cary R. Berlin
Represented By: Amy L. Wille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Martin
Represented By: Kassem M. Dakhlallah
Represented By: Mohamed Adib Nehme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaleta Beasley
Represented By: Stephen Jacob Chacko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ladonna Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?