Elite Diagnostics, LLC et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Andre Foster
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Intervenor Plaintiff: Elite Diagnostics, LLC and Northland Radiology, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv11924
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Settlement Conference set for 1/29/2021 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti (MWil) Modified on 8/20/2020 (MWil).
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Patti: Settlement Conference - To be conducted sometime after December 14, 2020. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER (PHASE I): Discovery due by 12/14/2020, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/29/2021. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (Refer to image for additional dates) (RLou)
August 20, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Linda V. Parker: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 8/20/2020. Disposition: Attorney Kevin J. Bacon failed to appear. The Court will issue a scheduling order. The parties shall review the Court's Practice Guidelines, including the section on how the Court handles discovery disputes. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (RLou)
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Blumberg, Gary)
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gary R. Blumberg appearing on behalf of Northland Radiology, Inc. (Blumberg, Gary)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2020 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker (RLou)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT ORDER Granting Substitution of Attorney. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Francisco J. Lozano on behalf of Elite Diagnostics, LLC. (Lozano, Francisco)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 EXHIBIT Ans INT Comp - Northland by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Bacon, Kevin)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 EXHIBIT Ans INT Comp - Elite by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Bacon, Kevin)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 EXHIBIT Ans to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Bacon, Kevin)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Regarding Removal. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
July 16, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Bacon, Kevin)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Third Circuit Court, case number 19-014085-NF. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7930308 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit S&C, #3 Exhibit Elite S&O Intervene, #4 Exhibit Elite Comp, #5 Exhibit Elite LARA Datasheet, #6 Exhibit Elite Articles of Corporation, #7 Exhibit Elite Annual Rpts, #8 Exhibit Kirnjot Sighn Rpt, #9 Exhibit Order Grant Northland Mot Intervene, #10 Exhibit Northland Intervene Comp, #11 Exhibit Northland Articles of Corporation, #12 Exhibit S&O Dism PLT) (Bacon, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elite Diagnostics, LLC et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin J. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Elite Diagnostics, LLC
Represented By: Andrew S. Khurana
Represented By: Timothy M. Hartner
Represented By: Francisco J. Lozano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Northland Radiology, Inc.
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Foster
Represented By: Kevin O. Kashat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?