General Steel Erectors, Inc. et al v. Westfield Insurance Company
Plaintiff: General Steel Erectors, Inc. and GSE Properties, LLC
Defendant: Westfield Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv11927
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Setting Response and Reply Dates to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and Brief in Support filed by Westfield Insurance Company., Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and Brief in Support :( Response due by 9/8/2020, Reply due by 9/18/2020) Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and Brief in Support by Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Westfield Policy, #3 Exhibit 2 - Denial Letter, #4 Exhibit 3 - McCartha v. State Farm Fire And Cas. Co., #5 Exhibit 4 - Community Garage Inc. v. Auto-Owners Insurance Co) (Meyer, Kurt)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Westfield Insurance Company (Meyer, Kurt)
July 17, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Westfield Insurance Company from Macomb County Circuit Court, case number 2020-001765-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7931093 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - General Steel Erectors Corporate Record, #3 Exhibit 2 - GSE Properties Organization Record, #4 Exhibit 3 - Westfields Ohio Incorporation Record) (Meyer, Kurt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Steel Erectors, Inc. et al v. Westfield Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Steel Erectors, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly M. Lubinski
Represented By: Samuel J. Behringer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GSE Properties, LLC
Represented By: Kimberly M. Lubinski
Represented By: Samuel J. Behringer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westfield Insurance Company
Represented By: Kurt D. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?