Schipper v. American Axle & Manufacturing Holdings, Inc. Business Sale Severance Plan et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Schipper
Defendant: American Axle & Manufacturing Holdings, Inc. Business Sale Severance Plan, Grede Holdings LLC and Grede II LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv11934
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Below, John)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Grede II LLC served on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. (Kotzian, David)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Grede Holdings LLC served on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. (Kotzian, David)
July 17, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Grede II LLC* (DWor)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Grede Holdings LLC* (DWor)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *American Axle & Manufacturing Holdings, Inc. Business Sale Severance Plan* (DWor)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Daniel Schipper against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7932997 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plan) (Kotzian, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schipper v. American Axle & Manufacturing Holdings, Inc. Business Sale Severance Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Axle & Manufacturing Holdings, Inc. Business Sale Severance Plan
Represented By: John T. Below
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grede Holdings LLC
Represented By: John T. Below
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grede II LLC
Represented By: John T. Below
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Schipper
Represented By: David A. Kotzian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?