Lewis v. Hurley Health Services, et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Lewis
Defendant: Dr. Keith B. Daniels, DPM, Hamilton Community Health Network, Inc. d/b/a Hamilton Community Health Network d/b/a Hamilton Community Health Network - Burton Medical Center, Hurley Health Services, City of Flint Board of Hospital Managers d/b/a Hurley Medical Center and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv11953
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Terrence G Berg
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cynthia Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15) (Peacock, Emily)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William A. Tanoury on behalf of City of Flint Board of Hospital Managers d/b/a Hurley Medical Center. (Tanoury, William)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to Respond re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States of America. Response due by 9/8/2020 Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Meredith Torres, #3 Exhibit B - HCHN Website, #4 Exhibit C - HRSA Website) (Parling, Brittany)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of substitution of parties. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (DPer)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany D. Parling on behalf of Keith B. Daniels, DPM, Hamilton Community Health Network, Inc. d/b/a Hamilton Community Health Network d/b/a Hamilton Community Health Network - Burton Medical Center. (Parling, Brittany)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Keith B. Daniels, DPM, Hamilton Community Health Network, Inc. d/b/a Hamilton Community Health Network d/b/a Hamilton Community Health Network - Burton Medical Center Substitution of Defendants (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Agency Declaration Verifying Employment and FTCA Deeming Notice, #3 Exhibit DOJ Certification of Scope of Employment) (Toomey, Zak)
July 21, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 [ENTERED IN ERROR] Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 7/28/2020 (DWor) Modified on 7/21/2020 (DWor).
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hamilton Community Health Network, Inc. d/b/a Hamilton Community Health Network d/b/a Hamilton Community Health Network - Burton Medical Center, Keith B. Daniels, DPM from Circuit Court for the County of Genesee, case number 20-114071. No Fee Required - US Government. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1. Agency Declaration Verifying Employment and FTCA Deeming Notice, #3 Exhibit 2. DOJ Certification of Scope of Employment) (Toomey, Zak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Hurley Health Services, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Keith B. Daniels, DPM
Represented By: Zak Toomey
Represented By: Brittany D. Parling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton Community Health Network, Inc. d/b/a Hamilton Community Health Network d/b/a Hamilton Community Health Network - Burton Medical Center
Represented By: Zak Toomey
Represented By: Brittany D. Parling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hurley Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Flint Board of Hospital Managers d/b/a Hurley Medical Center
Represented By: William A. Tanoury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Zak Toomey
Represented By: Brittany D. Parling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Lewis
Represented By: Emily M. Peacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?