Reed v. Detroit, City of et al
Plaintiff: Charletta Reed
Defendant: Ronald Gibson, Detroit Police Department and Detroit, City of
Interested Party: Fieger Law Firm
Case Number: 2:2020cv11960
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Lovell, Stephen)[JOINT STATUS REPORT] Modified on 9/17/2020 (DPer).
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, (Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2020 10:30 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Ronald Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation) (Feuer, Scott)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Detroit, City of. (Brooks, Robyn)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, (Response due by 8/31/2020). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ronald Gibson served on 7/26/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Lovell, Stephen)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott L. Feuer on behalf of Ronald Gibson. (Feuer, Scott)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Detroit Police Department served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (Lovell, Stephen)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Fieger Law Firm of attorney lien (Marko, Jonathan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Ronald Gibson* (LGra)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Detroit, City of* (LGra)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Detroit Police Department* (LGra)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Charletta Reed against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: BMIEDC-7938955 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Lovell, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Detroit, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Gibson
Represented By: Scott L. Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit, City of
Represented By: Robyn J. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charletta Reed
Represented By: Stephen M. Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Fieger Law Firm
Represented By: Jonathan R. Marko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?