BBK tobacco & Foods llp v. Ebay seller jillycut et al
Plaintiff: BBK tobacco & Foods llp
Defendant: Dawn Giangiuli, Ebay seller jillycut and Mark Giangiuli
Case Number: 2:2020cv12193
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Linda V Parker
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 23 REPORT on Filing or Determination of Action Regarding Patent or Trademark by All Plaintiffs (Ott, Lyndsay)
October 5, 2020 NOTICE of Error directed to: Lyndsay S. Ott. Form AO 120 is missing. The filing attorney must file the form found on www.uscourts.gov with the Court to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SSch)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendants to File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint (Responsive Pleading due by 10/13/2020). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
September 16, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick D. Elias on behalf of All Defendants. (Elias, Frederick)
September 10, 2020 Filing 20 EXHIBIT 7 re #9 Declaration,, by BBK tobacco & Foods llp [FILED IN THE TRADITIONAL MANNER] (SSch)
September 10, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria R Sinatra on behalf of BBK tobacco & Foods llp. (Sinatra, Maria)
September 10, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcella Ballard on behalf of BBK tobacco & Foods llp. (Ballard, Marcella)
September 8, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #13 Order on Motion for Leave to File, #9 Declaration,, of Filing Exhibits in the Traditional Manner (Ott, Lyndsay)
September 3, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ebay seller jillycut served on 8/30/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Ott, Lyndsay)
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Mark Giangiuli served on 8/30/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Ott, Lyndsay)
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Dawn Giangiuli served on 8/30/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Ott, Lyndsay)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Exhibit in the Traditional Manner. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit in the Traditional Manner by All Plaintiffs. (Ott, Lyndsay)
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 APPENDIX re: #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Additional Relief filed by BBK tobacco & Foods llp. by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Ott, Lyndsay)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lyndsay S. Ott appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ott, Lyndsay)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION by Kristen Ruisi re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Additional Relief, #1 Complaint,, filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20) (Ott, Lyndsay)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 DECLARATION by John Hood re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Additional Relief, #1 Complaint,, filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D) (Ott, Lyndsay)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION by Ian Kobe re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Additional Relief, #1 Complaint,, filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G) (Ott, Lyndsay)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Mark Giangiuli* (DWor)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Dawn Giangiuli* (DWor)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Ebay seller jillycut* (DWor)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Additional Relief by All Plaintiffs. (Ott, Lyndsay)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs (Ott, Lyndsay)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7988219 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F) (Ott, Lyndsay)
August 14, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BBK tobacco & Foods llp v. Ebay seller jillycut et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Giangiuli
Represented By: Frederick D. Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebay seller jillycut
Represented By: Frederick D. Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Giangiuli
Represented By: Frederick D. Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BBK tobacco & Foods llp
Represented By: Lyndsay S. Ott
Represented By: Maria R Sinatra
Represented By: Marcella Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?