Delin v Delin
Petitioner: Antoni D. Delin
Respondent: Lindsey M. Delin
Case Number: 2:2020cv12217
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Settlement Terms) (JCur)
September 14, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Status Conference set for 9/22/2020 is cancelled - parties settled. (JCur)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Request to Expedite Proceedings filed by Lindsey M. Delin. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (Flynn, Timothy)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Verified Petition filed by Lindsey M. Delin. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (Flynn, Timothy)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (Refer to image for additional dates) (JCur)
September 1, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: ZOOM Status Conference held on 9/1/2020. Disposition: Parties will submit a proposed scheduling order with dates; the Court will conduct another ZOOM status conference on: (9/22/2020 01:30 PM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman) (Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques) (JCur)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: ZOOM Status Conference set for 8/31/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (JCur) **HEARING WILL TAKE PLACE VIA ZOOM VIDEO--THE COURT WILL EMAIL INSTRUCTIONS AND CONNECTION LINK SEPARATELY**
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy P. Flynn on behalf of Lindsey M. Delin. (Flynn, Timothy)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Lindsey M. Delin served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service Bundle) (Hauser, Leah)
August 18, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for *Lindsey M. Delin* (SKra)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Simon Craddock, Solicitor of English & Welsh Law by Antoni D. Delin (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Marriage Certificate, #3 Exhibit B - Birth Certificates, #4 Exhibit C - Children Act 1989, #5 Document Continuation Certificate of Service) (Hauser, Leah)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia A. Perkins on behalf of Antoni D. Delin. (Perkins, Julia)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A Powers on behalf of Antoni D. Delin. (Powers, Kelly)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Leah M. Hauser on behalf of Antoni D. Delin. (Hauser, Leah)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Expedite Proceedings and Issue Initial Show Cause Order Pursuant to Hague Convention Law by Antoni D. Delin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Show Cause Order) (Cullen, Stephen)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Return of Children to England and Request for Issuance of Show Cause Order filed by Antoni D. Delin against Lindsey M. Delin. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7993849 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of Country - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Proposed Show Cause Order) (Cullen, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delin v Delin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lindsey M. Delin
Represented By: Timothy P. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antoni D. Delin
Represented By: Leah M. Hauser
Represented By: Stephen J Cullen
Represented By: Julia A. Perkins
Represented By: Kelly A Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?