Milan v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Michael Milan
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv12222
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Vacating #3 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand First Amended Complaint filed by Michael Milan against The Cincinnati Insurance Company. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Kelly, James)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Michael Milan. (Kelly, James)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Michael Milan to Show Cause why this Action should not be Dismissed for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 8/26/2020. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *The Cincinnati Insurance Company* (DWor)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Milan against The Cincinnati Insurance Company with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7994613 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Kelly, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milan v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Milan
Represented By: James J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?