Siromed Physician Services, Inc. v. DYMENT et al
Plaintiff: Siromed Physician Services, Inc.
Defendant: ALISON PREMO, MARINA DYMENT, TOM STATHAKIOS and PETER PANAGOPOULOS
Case Number: 2:2020cv12228
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Siromed Physician Services, Inc. (Curtner, Gregory)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Denying #8 Motion for TRO - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
August 20, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds: Motion Hearing held on 8/20/2020 re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Disposition: Motion denied (Defendant to submit a proposed order) (Court Reporter: Merilyn Jones) (LBar)
August 20, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Siromed Physician Services, Inc.. (Curtner, Gregory)
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Farina on behalf of All Defendants. (Farina, Steven)
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Vidya Mirmira on behalf of All Defendants. (Mirmira, Vidya)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Angela L. Jackson, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7) (Wallace, Bruce)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
August 19, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCE on #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2020 @ 1:00 PM before District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds |Zoom Webinar Information: https://zoom.us/j/95059963167?pwd=MklSZ1h5QjFVNDI0bGRkdmttVDZDZz09 Passcode: 219881 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +13126266799,,95059963167#,,,,,,0#,,219881# or +16027530140,,95059963167#,,,,,,0#,,219881#| (LBar)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Siromed Physician Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration) (Curtner, Gregory)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Bruce T. Wallace appearing on behalf of MARINA DYMENT, PETER PANAGOPOULOS, ALISON PREMO, TOM STATHAKIOS (Wallace, Bruce)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Adam Linkner appearing on behalf of MARINA DYMENT, PETER PANAGOPOULOS, ALISON PREMO, TOM STATHAKIOS (Linkner, Adam)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Angela L. Jackson appearing on behalf of MARINA DYMENT, PETER PANAGOPOULOS, ALISON PREMO, TOM STATHAKIOS (Jackson, Angela)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Kennison on behalf of Siromed Physician Services, Inc.. (Kennison, Matthew)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory L. Curtner on behalf of Siromed Physician Services, Inc.. (Curtner, Gregory)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Siromed Physician Services, Inc. (Curtner, Gregory)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Siromed Physician Services, Inc. against MARINA DYMENT, PETER PANAGOPOULOS, ALISON PREMO, TOM STATHAKIOS with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7994891 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Washtenaw County Circuit Court, 20-000697-CB, Judge Brown] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Curtner, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siromed Physician Services, Inc. v. DYMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALISON PREMO
Represented By: Bruce T. Wallace
Represented By: Vidya Mirmira
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: Adam Linkner
Represented By: Angela L. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARINA DYMENT
Represented By: Bruce T. Wallace
Represented By: Vidya Mirmira
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: Adam Linkner
Represented By: Angela L. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOM STATHAKIOS
Represented By: Bruce T. Wallace
Represented By: Vidya Mirmira
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: Adam Linkner
Represented By: Angela L. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER PANAGOPOULOS
Represented By: Bruce T. Wallace
Represented By: Vidya Mirmira
Represented By: Steven M. Farina
Represented By: Adam Linkner
Represented By: Angela L. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siromed Physician Services, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew P. Kennison
Represented By: Gregory L. Curtner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?