Allstate Insurance Company v. Fischer
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Dolores Fischer
Case Number: 2:2020cv12241
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT REQUIREMENTS AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Interim Status Conference set for 2/3/2021 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson; Discovery due by 3/31/2021; and Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 4/30/2021. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (Refer to image for additional dates) (EKar)
October 15, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/15/2020. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (EKar)
October 12, 2020 Filing 8 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (O'Sullivan, Maureen)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO ATTEND SCHEDULING CONFERNCE AND NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS FOR SUBMISSION OF DISCOVERY PLAN. (TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson) Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Non-Party Fault by Dolores Fischer (Rich, Kenneth)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses Reliance on Jury Demand by Dolores Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Reliance on Jury Demand, #2 Document Continuation Affirmative and/or Special Defenses) (Rich, Kenneth)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allstate Insurance Company (O'Sullivan, Maureen)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Dolores Fischer* (SKra)
August 19, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Dolores Fischer* (DWor)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Allstate Insurance Company against Dolores Fischer with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7996131 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Madison. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Wayne County Circuit Court, 18-003247-NI, Judge Dana M. Hathaway] (O'Sullivan, Maureen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Maureen O'Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolores Fischer
Represented By: Kenneth A. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?