Szydlo et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Mark Szydlo and Kimberly Szydlo
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv12243
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Discovery Following Status Conference. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
October 13, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Sean F. Cox: Status Conference held on 10/13/2020. Disposition: Limited Discovery Granted. Proposed Stipulated Order to be Submitted. (Status Conference re Facilitation set for 4/20/2021 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox) (JMcC)
October 12, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Tess Godhardt appearing on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (Godhardt, Tess)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 10/13/2020 at 03:30 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (JMcC)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Substitution of Attorney for Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kerry Lynn Rhoads appearing on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (Rhoads, Kerry)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Dunbar on behalf of Kimberly Szydlo, Mark Szydlo. (Dunbar, Aaron)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond I Foley on behalf of Kimberly Szydlo, Mark Szydlo. (Foley, Raymond)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A Gomez on behalf of Kimberly Szydlo, Mark Szydlo. (Gomez, Christopher)
August 19, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Southern District of West Virginia. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Docket Sheet from West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-08273.
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 161 - BSC PTO-11 - Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit ECF 184 - BSC PTO-13 - Stipulation for the Production of Docs and Electronically Stored Info, #3 Exhibit ECF 196 - BSC PTO-14 - New Direct Filing Order, Master Complaint, SF Complaint, #4 Exhibit ECF 197 - Master Long Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit ECF 200 - BSC_s Master Answer to Master Long Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit ECF 4955 - BSC PTO-175 - Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 4 Cases, #7 Exhibit ECF 4987 - BSC PTO-176 (Notice of Correction of Error in PTO-175 - Wave 4 Cases), #8 Exhibit ECF 6100 - BSC PTO-187 - Amended Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 4 Cases, #9 Exhibit ECF 7003 - Pltf_s MTE and Memo Anger, #10 Exhibit ECF 7069 - BSC_s Memo in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Anger, #11 Exhibit ECF 7173 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Anger, #12 Exhibit ECF 6984 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Badylak, #13 Exhibit ECF 4826 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Badylak, #14 Exhibit ECF 7067 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Badylak, #15 Exhibit ECF 4976 - BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #16 Exhibit ECF 5033 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #17 Exhibit ECF 6041 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Badylak, #18 Exhibit ECF 6995 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Little, #19 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 1, #20 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 2, #21 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 3, #22 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 4, #23 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 5, #24 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Little, #25 Exhibit ECF 7066 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Little, #26 Exhibit ECF 4979 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Little, #27 Exhibit ECF 5034 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Little, #28 Exhibit ECF 6044 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Little, #29 Exhibit ECF 7000 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Caraballo, #30 Exhibit ECF 4831 - Motion and Memo in Support of Pltf_s MTE re Caraballo, #31 Exhibit ECF 7063 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Caraballo, #32 Exhibit ECF 4973 - BSC_s Memo in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Caraballo, #33 Exhibit ECF 5029 - Pltf_s Reply to BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Caraballo, #34 Exhibit ECF 6042 - Memo Opinion and Order re Caraballo, #35 Exhibit ECF 7004 - Pltf_s MTE and Memo re Spiegelberg, #36 Exhibit ECF 4827 - Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg and Memo in Support, #37 Exhibit ECF 7088 - BSC_s Response in Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #38 Exhibit ECF 4969 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #39 Exhibit ECF 7160 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #40 Exhibit ECF 5031 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #41 Exhibit ECF 6049 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Spiegelberg, #42 Exhibit ECF 7009 - BSCs Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Guelcher, #43 Exhibit ECF 7057 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Guelcher, #44 Exhibit ECF 7166 - BSCs Notice of Adoption of BSC's Prior Reply MTE Guelcher, #45 Exhibit ECF 7015 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Dr. V. Iakovlev, #46 Exhibit ECF 4819 - BSC_s MTE Iakovlev, #47 Exhibit ECF 7050 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Daubert Response re Iakovlev, #48 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh A1, #49 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh A2, #50 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh B, #51 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh D, #52 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh E, #53 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Pltf_s Response to BSC_s MTE Iakovlev, #54 Exhibit ECF 6033 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Iakovlev, #55 Exhibit ECF 7017 - BSCs Notice of Adoption of Prior MTE Margolis, #56 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC_s MTE Margolis and Memo in Support, #57 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh A, #58 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh B, #59 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh C, #60 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh D, #61 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh E, #62 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh F, #63 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh G, #64 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh H, #65 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh I, #66 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh J, #67 Exhibit ECF 7046 - Pltfs' Notice of Adoption of Response re Margolis, #68 Exhibit ECF 4960 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Margolis, #69 Exhibit ECF 6035 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Margolis, #70 Exhibit ECF 7018 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Pence, #71 Exhibit ECF 4815 - BSC_s MTE Pence and Memo in Support, #72 Exhibit ECF 7047 - Pltfs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Pence, #73 Exhibit ECF 4968 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Pence, #74 Exhibit ECF 6038 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Pence, #75 Exhibit ECF 7011 - BSC's MTE General Causation Testimony of Dr. B. Rosenzweig, #76 Exhibit ECF 7085 - Pltf's Response to BSC's MTE General Causation Testimony of Rosenzweig, #77 Exhibit ECF 7175 - BSC's Reply ISO MTE General Causation Testimony of Rosenzweig, #78 Exhibit ECF 6039 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Rosenzweig, #79 Exhibit ECF 52 - BSC_s Memo MTE Guelcher, #80 Exhibit ECF 74 - Ptfs Opp to Dft_s MTE Guelcher, #81 Exhibit ECF 88 - BSC_s Reply MTE Guelcher, #82 Exhibit ECF 100 - Memo, Opinion, and Order (Daubert Motions), #83 Exhibit ECF 216 - Pltf_s Memo in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #84 Exhibit ECF 275 - BSC_s Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #85 Exhibit ECF 275 - Exh A, #86 Exhibit ECF 275 - Exh B, #87 Exhibit ECF 473 - Amended Memo Opinion and Order (Daubert Motions))(Anielak, Eric) (Modified on 8/19/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 8/19/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 8/18/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/5/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from wvsd on 8/19/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDSHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt # 0425-2355728. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jws) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-08273.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Szydlo et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Tess Godhardt
Represented By: Kerry Lynn Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Szydlo
Represented By: Aaron Dunbar
Represented By: Christopher A Gomez
Represented By: Raymond I Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Szydlo
Represented By: Aaron Dunbar
Represented By: Christopher A Gomez
Represented By: Raymond I Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?