Martinizing International, LLC v. Keenze et al
Plaintiff: Martinizing International, LLC
Defendant: Barbara Keenze and Tom Keenze
Case Number: 2:2020cv12289
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Martinizing International, LLC (Sokol, Elizabeth)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Martinizing International, LLC (Sokol, Elizabeth)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The #4 Order to Show Cause is hereby SATISIFED. Issued by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by All Plaintiffs. (Sokol, Elizabeth)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 9/4/2020 Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
August 25, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Barbara Keenze* (SKra)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Tom Keenze* (SKra)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8007154 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland County, MI - County Where Action Arose: Oakland County, MI - County of 1st Defendant: Eas County, OK. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Sokol, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinizing International, LLC v. Keenze et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Keenze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Keenze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martinizing International, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Sokol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?