Richardson
Appellant: Collene K Corcoran
Appellee: Kim Richardson
Case Number: 2:2020cv12322
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEF of Appellant by Collene K Corcoran. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Certificate of Service) (O'Connor, Sandra)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Appellant Brief due by 10/26/2020 Appellee Brief due by 11/24/2020 Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 Designated Bankruptcy Record (VLun)
September 25, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE of Receipt of Complete Record on Appeal (VLun)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra L. O'Connor on behalf of Collene K Corcoran. (O'Connor, Sandra)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal (VLun)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Collene K Corcoran, Bankruptcy Court case number 20-30790. This transmittal does not include the following: Bankruptcy Case Cover Sheet. (VLun)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Collene K Corcoran
Represented By: Sandra L. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kim Richardson
Represented By: David R. Ienna
Represented By: Terrance A. Hiller, Jr.
Represented By: Hussein Nasser Rahal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?