Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company v. Buckeye Terminals, LLC
Plaintiff: Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Defendant: Buckeye Terminals, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv12343
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company identifying Corporate Parent Canadian National Railway Company for Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company. (McLeod, Peter)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Buckeye Terminals, LLC served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. (McLeod, Peter)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Ellis on behalf of Buckeye Terminals, LLC. (Ellis, Nicholas)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Buckeye Terminals, LLC* (SOso)
September 8, 2020 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Buckeye Terminals, LLC. (McLeod, Peter)
August 28, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (ATee)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Filed by Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company against Buckeye Terminals, LLC filed by Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company against Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company. No summons requested. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8014168 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-Demurrage tariff items, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-Invoices Outlining demurrage and documentation charges, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C-Spreadsheet summarization of demurrage and documentation charges) (McLeod, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company v. Buckeye Terminals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Terminals, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas J. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Represented By: Peter C. McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?