Williams v. Rurka
Plaintiff: Kenneth Karl Williams
Defendant: Noah Nagy, Jeremy Bush, Russell Rurka, Michigan Department of Corrections and Heidi Washington
Case Number: 2:2020cv12349
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Limited Appearance by Alicia M. Lane on behalf of Russell Rurka for the purposes of the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program. (Lane, Alicia)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER STAYING CASE and referral to the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPer)
September 16, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #3 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on Kenneth Karl Williams, 234758, G. ROBERT COTTON CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, 3500 N. ELM ROAD, JACKSON, MI 49201. (DPar)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 OPINION AND ORDER granting #2 Application to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs and partially dismissing complaint. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPer)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Kenneth Karl Williams. (DAll)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kenneth Karl Williams against Jeremy Bush, Michigan Department of Corrections, Noah Nagy, Russell Rurka, Heidi Washington (DAll) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2020: #1 COVERSHEET) (DAll).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Rurka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noah Nagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Rurka
Represented By: Alicia M. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Karl Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?