Alizadeh et al v. Katebian et al
Plaintiff: Skymark SPE, LLC, Skymark Properties II, LLC, Laila Alizadeh, Liberty & York, Inc., Skymark Properties Corporation, Inc., 2399021 Ontario, Inc. and Skymark Properties III, LLC
Defendant: Jordan Asher Samuel, Panter Sahebdivani, Hoseinali Sahebdivani, Green Lake Real Estate Fund, LLC, Payam Katebian, 2638168 Ontario, Inc., Morteza Katebian, Ali Behrouz, Flemington Capital Corporation and Morrow GA Investors, LLC
Consolidated Plaintiff: Fred A Schwartz
Case Number: 2:2020cv12372
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Sean F Cox
2 Judge: Laurie J Michelson
3 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Hoseinali Sahebdivani by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Troy Wilson, #3 Exhibit 2 - Troy Wilson CV) (Kochanowski, Andrew)
October 29, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Payam Katebian by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Troy Wilson, #3 Exhibit 2 - Troy Wilson CV) (Kochanowski, Andrew)
October 27, 2020 Filing 42 EXHIBIT 11 - Affidavit of Meritorious Defense re #41 MOTION to Set Aside #21 Request for Clerks Entry of Default, #28 Clerks Entry of Default, #20 Request for Clerks Entry of Default, #22 Clerks Entry of Default, #27 Request for Clerks Entry of Default, #18 Clerks Entry of Default, #19 Cl by Flemington Capital Corporation, Morteza Katebian, Payam Katebian, Morrow GA Investors, LLC, Hoseinali Sahebdivani (Walsh, Sean)
October 27, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION to Set Aside #21 Request for Clerks Entry of Default, #28 Clerks Entry of Default, #20 Request for Clerks Entry of Default, #22 Clerks Entry of Default, #27 Request for Clerks Entry of Default, #18 Clerks Entry of Default, #19 Clerks Entry of Default, #16 Request for Clerks Entry of Default, #23 Clerks Entry of Default, #17 Request for Clerks Entry of Default by 2638168 Ontario, Inc., Ali Behrouz, Flemington Capital Corporation, Morteza Katebian, Payam Katebian, Morrow GA Investors, LLC, Hoseinali Sahebdivani, Panter Sahebdivani, Jordan Asher Samuel. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Clerk's Entry of Default - Morteza Katebian, #3 Exhibit 2 - Clerk's Entry of Default - Payam Katebian, #4 Exhibit 3 - Clerk's Entry of Default - Morrow GA Investors II, LLC, #5 Exhibit 4 - Clerk's Entry of Default - Flemington Capital Corp., #6 Exhibit 5 - Application for Clerk's Entry of Default - Morteza Katebian, #7 Exhibit 6 - Application for Clerk's Entry of Default - Payam Katebian, #8 Exhibit 7 - Application for Clerk's Entry of Default - Morrow GA Investors II, LLC, #9 Exhibit 8 - Clerk's Entry of Default - Hoseinali Sahebdivani, #10 Exhibit 9 - Application for Clerk's Entry of Default - Hoseinali Sahebdivani, #11 Exhibit 10 - Application for Clerk's Entry of Default - Flemington Capital Corp., #12 Exhibit 12 - 7-20-18 Email from Missaghi to Morteza Katebian, #13 Exhibit 13 - Declaration of Bahram Azizbeiki, #14 Exhibit 14 - 11-24-19 Detroit Free Press Article, #15 Exhibit 15 - Sentencing Transcript of Attorney Vakili, #16 Exhibit 16 - Summons & Complaint Re-Served 10-23-20, #17 Exhibit 17 - Summons & Complaint Re-Served 10-23-20) (Walsh, Sean)
October 26, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE by 2638168 Ontario, Inc., Ali Behrouz, Flemington Capital Corporation, Morteza Katebian, Payam Katebian, Morrow GA Investors, LLC, Hoseinali Sahebdivani, Panter Sahebdivani, Jordan Asher Samuel of withdrawal of #34 Amended MOTION to Set Aside Defaults . (Boettcher, Matthew)
October 26, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Black on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Black, David)
October 26, 2020 Filing 38 EXHIBIT to Motion to Set Aside by 2638168 Ontario, Inc. (Gianino, Richard) Modified on 10/26/2020 (JMcC).[DOCUMENT WAS SIGNED BY SEAN M. WALSH] Modified on 10/26/2020 (JMcC). (PER COUNSEL, EXHIBITS TO ECF NO. #30 )
October 26, 2020 Filing 37 INDEX of Exhibits re #30 Joint MOTION to Set Aside Clerks Entry of Default by 2638168 Ontario, Inc. (Gianino, Richard) Modified on 10/26/2020 (JMcC). [DOCUMENT WAS SIGNED BY SEAN M. WALSH]
October 26, 2020 Filing 36 EXHIBIT 5 re #35 Exhibit Index, by Flemington Capital Corporation, Morteza Katebian, Payam Katebian, Morrow GA Investors, LLC, Hoseinali Sahebdivani (Walsh, Sean)
October 26, 2020 Filing 35 INDEX of Exhibits re #34 Amended MOTION to Set Aside Defaults by Flemington Capital Corporation, Morteza Katebian, Payam Katebian, Morrow GA Investors, LLC, Hoseinali Sahebdivani with Exhibits 1, 2, 3 & 4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 & 3, #3 Exhibit 4) (Walsh, Sean)
October 26, 2020 NOTICE of Error directed to: Sean M. Walsh re #32 Joint MOTION to Set Aside #31 Joint MOTION to Set Aside #30 Joint MOTION to Set Aside Clerks Entry of Default . Wrong or incomplete PDF image was uploaded. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (LGra)
October 26, 2020 Filing 34 Amended MOTION to Set Aside Defaults by Flemington Capital Corporation, Morteza Katebian, Payam Katebian, Morrow GA Investors, LLC, Hoseinali Sahebdivani. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Brief in Support) (Walsh, Sean)
October 26, 2020 NOTICE of Error directed to: Sean M. Walsh re #33 Joint MOTION to Set Aside #32 Joint MOTION to Set Aside #31 Joint MOTION to Set Aside #30 Joint MOTION to Set Aside Clerks Entry of Default . Wrong or incomplete PDF image was uploaded. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (LGra)
October 26, 2020 Filing 33 [STRICKEN] Joint MOTION to Set Aside #32 Joint MOTION to Set Aside #31 Joint MOTION to Set Aside #30 Joint MOTION to Set Aside Clerks Entry of Default by 2638168 Ontario, Inc., Ali Behrouz, Flemington Capital Corporation, Morteza Katebian, Payam Katebian, Morrow GA Investors, LLC, Hoseinali Sahebdivani, Panter Sahebdivani, Jordan Asher Samuel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 10) (Walsh, Sean) Modified on 10/26/2020 (LGra).
October 26, 2020 NOTICE of Error directed to: Sean M. Walsh re #31 Joint MOTION to Set Aside #30 Joint MOTION to Set Aside Clerks Entry of Default . Wrong or incomplete PDF image was uploaded. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (LGra)
October 26, 2020 Filing 32 [STRICKEN] Joint MOTION to Set Aside #31 Joint MOTION to Set Aside #30 Joint MOTION to Set Aside Clerks Entry of Default by 2638168 Ontario, Inc., Ali Behrouz, Flemington Capital Corporation, Green Lake Real Estate Fund, LLC, Morteza Katebian, Payam Katebian, Morrow GA Investors, LLC, Hoseinali Sahebdivani, Panter Sahebdivani, Jordan Asher Samuel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5) (Walsh, Sean) Modified on 10/26/2020 (LGra).
October 26, 2020 Filing 31 [STRICKEN] Joint MOTION to Set Aside #30 Joint MOTION to Set Aside Clerks Entry of Default by 2638168 Ontario, Inc., Ali Behrouz, Flemington Capital Corporation, Morteza Katebian, Payam Katebian, Morrow GA Investors, LLC, Hoseinali Sahebdivani, Panter Sahebdivani, Jordan Asher Samuel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 & 3, #3 Exhibit 4) (Walsh, Sean) Modified on 10/26/2020 (LGra).
October 25, 2020 Filing 30 Joint MOTION to Set Aside Clerks Entry of Default by 2638168 Ontario, Inc., Ali Behrouz, Flemington Capital Corporation, Morteza Katebian, Payam Katebian, Morrow GA Investors, LLC, Hoseinali Sahebdivani, Panter Sahebdivani, Jordan Asher Samuel. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Index of Exhibits) (Walsh, Sean)
October 25, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean M. Walsh on behalf of 2638168 Ontario, Inc., Ali Behrouz, Flemington Capital Corporation, Morteza Katebian, Payam Katebian, Morrow GA Investors, LLC, Hoseinali Sahebdivani, Panter Sahebdivani, Jordan Asher Samuel. (Walsh, Sean)
October 21, 2020 Filing 28 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Hoseinali Sahebdivani* (LGra)
October 21, 2020 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Hoseinali Sahebdivani by All Plaintiffs. (Kochanowski, Andrew)
October 21, 2020 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Hoseinali Sahebdivani served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Kochanowski, Andrew)
October 13, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Morteza Katebian by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Troy Wilson, #3 Exhibit 2 - Troy Wilson CV) (Kochanowski, Andrew)
October 8, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Flemington Capital Corporation, Morrow GA Investors, LLC by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Troy Wilson, #3 Exhibit 2 - Troy Wilson CV) (Kochanowski, Andrew)
October 8, 2020 Filing 23 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Payam Katebian* (LGra)
October 8, 2020 Filing 22 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Morteza Katebian* (LGra)
October 8, 2020 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Morteza Katebian by All Plaintiffs. (Kochanowski, Andrew)
October 8, 2020 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Payam Katebian by All Plaintiffs. (Kochanowski, Andrew)
October 5, 2020 Filing 19 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Morrow GA Investors, LLC* (LGra)
October 5, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Flemington Capital Corporation* (LGra)
October 1, 2020 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Morrow GA Investors, LLC by All Plaintiffs. (Kochanowski, Andrew)
October 1, 2020 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Flemington Capital Corporation by All Plaintiffs. (Kochanowski, Andrew)
September 30, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #14 Ex Parte MOTION for (1) Order Nunc Pro Tunc that Service was Made on Defendant Morteza Katebian on September 10, 2020 or (2) That Service May be Mad by Email with Notice to Defendant's Attorney by All Plaintiffs Upon Sean Walsh, Esq. (Kochanowski, Andrew)
September 29, 2020 Filing 14 Ex Parte MOTION for (1) Order Nunc Pro Tunc that Service was Made on Defendant Morteza Katebian on September 10, 2020 or (2) That Service May be Mad by Email with Notice to Defendant's Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Troy Wilson, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Andrew Kochanowski, #4 Exhibit 3 - Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process Filed in Superior Court of Fulton County, GA) (Kochanowski, Andrew)
September 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Grosman on behalf of Green Lake Real Estate Fund, LLC. (Grosman, Christopher)
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Weisberg on behalf of Green Lake Real Estate Fund, LLC. (Weisberg, Robert)
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Morrow GA Investors, LLC served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Kochanowski, Andrew)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Payam Katebian served on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Kochanowski, Andrew)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Morteza Katebian served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (Kochanowski, Andrew)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Flemington Capital Corporation served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Kochanowski, Andrew)
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Green Lake Real Estate Fund, LLC served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Kochanowski, Andrew)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Declining to Exercise Supplemental Jurisdiction Over any State-Law Claims in this Action. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Laurie J. Michelson and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford to District Judge Sean F. Cox and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Fred A. Schwartz on behalf of Fred A Schwartz. (Schwartz, Fred)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Fred A. Schwartz on behalf of Fred A Schwartz. (Schwartz, Fred)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
September 1, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8018760 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of Country - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of Country. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): ED Michigan, 18-cv-13379, Judge Hon. Sean Cox] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet) (Kochanowski, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alizadeh et al v. Katebian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Asher Samuel
Represented By: Sean M. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panter Sahebdivani
Represented By: Sean M. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoseinali Sahebdivani
Represented By: Sean M. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Lake Real Estate Fund, LLC
Represented By: Christopher A. Grosman
Represented By: Robert A. Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payam Katebian
Represented By: Sean M. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2638168 Ontario, Inc.
Represented By: Sean M. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morteza Katebian
Represented By: Sean M. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Behrouz
Represented By: Sean M. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flemington Capital Corporation
Represented By: Sean M. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morrow GA Investors, LLC
Represented By: Sean M. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skymark SPE, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kochanowski
Represented By: David M. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skymark Properties II, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kochanowski
Represented By: David M. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laila Alizadeh
Represented By: Andrew Kochanowski
Represented By: David M. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty & York, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Kochanowski
Represented By: David M. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skymark Properties Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Kochanowski
Represented By: David M. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2399021 Ontario, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Kochanowski
Represented By: David M. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skymark Properties III, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kochanowski
Represented By: David M. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Fred A Schwartz
Represented By: Fred A. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?