Williams et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Tim Williams and Marlene Williams
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv12381
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David M Lawson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Status Conference on 10/28/2020 is Cancelled re #7 Notice to Appear and RESCHEDULED to 11/12/2020 at 4:00 p.m. via teleconference. (SPin)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER striking improper filing. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (DPer)
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO 10/22/20 ORDER] STIPULATION for Sub of Counsel by Boston Scientific Corporation (Rhoads, Kerry) Modified on 10/22/2020 (DPer).
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 10/28/2020 at 10:00 AM before District Judge David M. Lawson. |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1618516483?pwd=RWpZY2JJeVBKYjBHRWExSlc0QytmZz09 Passcode: 160731 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1618516483# or +16468287666,,1618516483#| (SPin)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kerry Lynn Rhoads appearing on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (Rhoads, Kerry)
October 7, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #5 Order on counsel for Boston Scientific Corporation via email: jkeale@tktrial.com; jtanenbaum@tktrial.com; jstrongman@shb.com; and mbonasso@fsblaw.com. (SPin)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE APPEARANCES by 10/20/2020. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
September 2, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Southern District of West Virginia. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 Docket Sheet from West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-01342.
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 8/27/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 8/26/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/13/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/2/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT filed by Marlene Williams, Tim Williams against Boston Scientific Corporation, Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC. (Cook, Wesley) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/2/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDSHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt # 0425-2190852. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gjb) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-01342.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Kerry Lynn Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Williams
Represented By: Fred Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Williams
Represented By: Fred Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?