Tecumseh Compressor Company LLC v. AJ's Electrical Testing & Services LLC
Plaintiff: Tecumseh Compressor Company LLC
Defendant: AJ's Electrical Testing & Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv12471
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow: Status Conference held on 10/27/2020. Counsel to confer and submit a proposed scheduling order within 14 days. (MLan)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J Currie, Jr on behalf of Tecumseh Compressor Company LLC. (Currie, Edward)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 10/27/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. Conference to discuss the relationship between this case and the possible companion in the Northern District of Mississippi. Counsel will receive Zoom invitation by email. (MLan)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by AJ's Electrical Testing & Services LLC (Witenoff, Stephen)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #3 Answer (Free), #4 Affirmative Defenses by AJ's Electrical Testing & Services LLC (Witenoff, Stephen)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by AJ's Electrical Testing & Services LLC (Witenoff, Stephen)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER by AJ's Electrical Testing & Services LLC. (Witenoff, Stephen)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Notice of Removal, by AJ's Electrical Testing & Services LLC (Witenoff, Stephen)
September 9, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Washtenaw, case number 20-000753-CK. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8035949 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): USDC Northern District of Mississippi, 1:20-cv-00089, Judge Debra Brown] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Witenoff, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tecumseh Compressor Company LLC v. AJ's Electrical Testing & Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AJ's Electrical Testing & Services LLC
Represented By: Stephen L. Witenoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tecumseh Compressor Company LLC
Represented By: J. Michael Huget
Represented By: Edward J Currie, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?