Energy Michigan, Inc. et al v. Michigan Public Service Commission et al
Plaintiff: Association of Businesses Advocating Tariff Equity and Energy Michigan, Inc.
Defendant: Tremaine L. Phillips, Sally A. Talberg, Michigan Public Service Commission and Daniel C Scripps
Case Number: 2:2020cv12521
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David M Lawson
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION to Set the Deadline to Respond to the Complaint by All Defendants (Sattler, Spencer)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Spencer A. Sattler appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Sattler, Spencer)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Benjamin Holwerda appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Holwerda, Benjamin)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nicholas Quinn Taylor appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Taylor, Nicholas)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Tremaine L. Phillips waiver sent on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Doyle, Brion)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Sally A. Talberg waiver sent on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Doyle, Brion)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Michigan Public Service Commission waiver sent on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Doyle, Brion)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Daniel C Scripps waiver sent on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Doyle, Brion)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Pattwell on behalf of Association of Businesses Advocating Tariff Equity. (Pattwell, Michael)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary C. Larsen on behalf of Association of Businesses Advocating Tariff Equity. (Larsen, Zachary)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Energy Michigan, Inc. against Michigan Public Service Commission, Tremaine L. Phillips, Daniel C Scripps, Sally A. Talberg. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8045168 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Ingham - County Where Action Arose: Ingham - County of 1st Defendant: Eaton. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - June 28, 2018 Order, #2 Exhibit B - August 1, 2018 Memorandum) (Doyle, Brion)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Energy Michigan, Inc. et al v. Michigan Public Service Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tremaine L. Phillips
Represented By: Spencer A. Sattler
Represented By: Benjamin Holwerda
Represented By: Nicholas Quinn Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally A. Talberg
Represented By: Spencer A. Sattler
Represented By: Benjamin Holwerda
Represented By: Nicholas Quinn Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Public Service Commission
Represented By: Spencer A. Sattler
Represented By: Benjamin Holwerda
Represented By: Nicholas Quinn Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel C Scripps
Represented By: Spencer A. Sattler
Represented By: Benjamin Holwerda
Represented By: Nicholas Quinn Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of Businesses Advocating Tariff Equity
Represented By: Michael J. Pattwell
Represented By: Zachary C. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Energy Michigan, Inc.
Represented By: Brion B. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?