Signal AHF Medical Receivables Holdco LLC v. Integrated MRI Center, LLC d/b/a Complete Imaging et al
Plaintiff: Signal AHF Medical Receivables Holdco LLC
Defendant: North West Labs, Inc., Omar Elias a/k/a Omar Asker, Zina Petros and Integrated MRI Center, LLC d/b/a Complete Imaging
Case Number: 2:2020cv12553
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Laurie J Michelson
2 Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Omar Elias a/k/a Omar Asker, Integrated MRI Center, LLC d/b/a Complete Imaging, North West Labs, Inc., Zina Petros. (Warren, Emily)
November 6, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T. Jane on behalf of Signal AHF Medical Receivables Holdco LLC. (Jane, Matthew)
November 5, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(3) filed by Signal AHF Medical Receivables Holdco LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A - Decl. of E. Nerenberg w Attchmts, #2 Exhibit Exh B - Copperfield Villas Ass_n v. Tuer_ 2020 Mich. App. LEXIS, #3 Exhibit Exh C - FCA US LLC v. Rightthing_ LLC_ 2018 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 21) (Sahu, Saura)
October 19, 2020 Filing 14 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by North West Labs, Inc. (Joelson, Peter)
October 19, 2020 Filing 13 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Integrated MRI Center, LLC d/b/a Complete Imaging (Joelson, Peter)
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter W. Joelson on behalf of All Defendants. (Joelson, Peter)
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (AChu)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER of Recusal and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Laurie J. Michelson to District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (NAhm)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Omar Elias a/k/a Omar Asker, Integrated MRI Center, LLC d/b/a Complete Imaging, North West Labs, Inc., Zina Petros. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - LARA Filings for AHF Great Lakes, Inc., #3 Exhibit 2 - Safeco v Posen) (Warren, Emily)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gary R. Blumberg appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Blumberg, Gary)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Emily R. Warren appearing on behalf of Omar Elias a/k/a Omar Asker, Integrated MRI Center, LLC d/b/a Complete Imaging, North West Labs, Inc., Zina Petros (Warren, Emily)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Zina Petros served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Sahu, Saura)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. North West Labs, Inc. served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Sahu, Saura)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Integrated MRI Center, LLC d/b/a Complete Imaging served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Sahu, Saura)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Omar Elias a/k/a Omar Asker served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Sahu, Saura)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
September 21, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Signal AHF Medical Receivables Holdco LLC against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8054022 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland County, MI - County Where Action Arose: Oakland County, MI - County of 1st Defendant: Dade County, FL. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Sahu, Saura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Signal AHF Medical Receivables Holdco LLC v. Integrated MRI Center, LLC d/b/a Complete Imaging et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North West Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Elias a/k/a Omar Asker
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zina Petros
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrated MRI Center, LLC d/b/a Complete Imaging
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Signal AHF Medical Receivables Holdco LLC
Represented By: Saura J. Sahu
Represented By: Matthew T. Jane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?