Cowans v. Detroit, City of et al
Plaintiff: David Cowans
Defendant: Paul Knapp, John Nickowski, Wesley Cowan-Williams, Matthew Kurek, B.E. Sadd, Inc. and Detroit, City of
Case Number: 2:2020cv13050
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Curtis Ivy
Referring Judge: David M Lawson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 9 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Wilder, Marvin)
December 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 1/25/2021 at 9:00 AM before District Judge David M. Lawson. (See image for document deadline.) (SPin)
December 18, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by B.E. Sadd, Inc., John Nickowski. (Mullett, John)
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Mullett on behalf of B.E. Sadd, Inc., John Nickowski. (Mullett, John)
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. John Nickowski served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Wilder, Marvin)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. B.E. Sadd, Inc. served on 10/27/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Wilder, Marvin)
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 RESPONSE to #2 Order Requiring Submission of Information regarding Removal by Wesley Cowan-Williams, Detroit, City of, Paul Knapp, Matthew Kurek. (Hiltner, Philip)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER Requiring Submission of Information Regarding Removal. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
November 16, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Detroit, City of, Wesley Cowan-Williams, Paul Knapp, Matthew Kurek from Third Judicial Circuit of Michigan, case number 20-013263-NO. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8166877 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Hiltner, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cowans v. Detroit, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Knapp
Represented By: Philip J. Hiltner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Nickowski
Represented By: John A. Mullett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Cowan-Williams
Represented By: Philip J. Hiltner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Kurek
Represented By: Philip J. Hiltner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.E. Sadd, Inc.
Represented By: John A. Mullett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit, City of
Represented By: Philip J. Hiltner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Cowans
Represented By: Marvin D. Wilder
Represented By: Lillian F. Diallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?