El Hage v. U.S, Department of State et al
Petitioner: Zou El Ficar El Hage
Respondent: U.S. Department of State Office of Visa Services, Director, FBI Christopher Wray, Ambassador, US Emba Dorothy Shea, Executive Director o Stephen B Dietz, U.S. Department of State Bureau of Consular Affairs, Assistant Secretary Carl Risch, Secretary if State Mike Pompeo, Consul General, U.S. Embassy Lebbanon, U.S. Department of State Bureau of Diplomatic Security and U.S, Department of State
Case Number: 2:2020cv13091
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of Consul General, U.S. Embassy Lebbanon served on 12/1/2020, answer due 2/1/2021; Stephen B Dietz served on 12/1/2020, answer due 2/1/2021; Zou El Ficar El Hage served on 12/1/2020, answer due 2/1/2021; Mike Pompeo served on 12/1/2020, answer due 2/1/2021; Carl Risch served on 12/1/2020, answer due 2/1/2021; Dorothy Shea served on 12/1/2020, answer due 2/1/2021; U.S, Department of State served on 12/1/2020, answer due 2/1/2021; U.S. Department of State Bureau of Consular Affairs served on 12/1/2020, answer due 2/1/2021; U.S. Department of State Bureau of Diplomatic Security served on 12/1/2020, answer due 2/1/2021; U.S. Department of State Office of Visa Services served on 12/1/2020, answer due 2/1/2021; Christopher Wray served on 12/1/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Summons/Return of Service) (Birach, Robert)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (ATee)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Consul General, U.S. Embassy Lebbanon, Stephen B Dietz, Mike Pompeo, Carl Risch, Dorothy Shea, U.S, Department of State, U.S. Department of State Bureau of Consular Affairs, U.S. Department of State Bureau of Diplomatic Security, U.S. Department of State Office of Visa Services, Christopher Wray* (ATee)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Zou El Ficar El Hage against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8177852 - Fee: 400 dollars. County of 1st Plaintiff: N/A - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Exhibits A-I) (Birach, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El Hage v. U.S, Department of State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Department of State Office of Visa Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, FBI Christopher Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ambassador, US Emba Dorothy Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Executive Director o Stephen B Dietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Department of State Bureau of Consular Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Assistant Secretary Carl Risch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary if State Mike Pompeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Consul General, U.S. Embassy Lebbanon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Department of State Bureau of Diplomatic Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S, Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Zou El Ficar El Hage
Represented By: Robert M. Birach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?