King et al v. Whitmer et al
Plaintiff: Daren Rubingh, Charles Ritchard, Timothy King, James Hooper, John Haggard and Marian Sheridan
Defendant: Michigan Board of State Canvassers, Jocelyn Benson and Gretchen Whitmer
Intervenor Defendant: Democratic National Committee, City of Detroit, Michigan Democratic Party and Robert Davis
Amicus Curiae: Michigan State Conference NAACP
Case Number: 2:2020cv13134
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Junttila, Stefanie)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Emergency MOTION to Strike #92 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Robert Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Email Chain) (Paterson, Andrew)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs. (Junttila, Stefanie)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #94 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; and #96 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 RESPONSE to #78 MOTION for Sanctions , for Disciplinary Action, for Disbarment Referral and for Referral to State Bar Disciplinary Bodies filed by All Plaintiffs. (Junttila, Stefanie)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' opposition to the City of Detroits Motion for Sanctions, Disciplinary actions, Disbarment Referral and for Referral to the State Bar Disciplinary Bodies and to Defendants Whitmer and Benson's Concurrence in the City of Detroit's Motion for Sanctions by All Plaintiffs. (Junttila, Stefanie)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 RESPONSE to #69 MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' counsel filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Junttila, Stefanie)
January 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to Robert Davis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit) (Junttila, Stefanie)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to Michigan Democratic Party (Junttila, Stefanie)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to Michigan Board of State Canvassers (Junttila, Stefanie)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to Democratic National Committee (Junttila, Stefanie)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to Gretchen Whitmer (Junttila, Stefanie)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to City of Detroit (Junttila, Stefanie)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to Jocelyn Benson (Junttila, Stefanie)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 RESPONSE to #72 MOTION to Dismiss , #70 MOTION to Dismiss , #73 MOTION to Dismiss and for Sanctions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Junttila, Stefanie)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE of Joinder/Concurrence in #78 MOTION for Sanctions , for Disciplinary Action, for Disbarment Referral and for Referral to State Bar Disciplinary Bodies filed by City of Detroit by Jocelyn Benson, Gretchen Whitmer (Meingast, Heather)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 RESPONSE to #82 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by City of Detroit. (Fink, David)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Junttila, Stefanie)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Striking #80 MOTION for Extension of Time. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part the #82 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to #70 Motion to Dismiss, #73 Motion to Dismiss and for Sanctions, and #72 Motion to Dismiss. (Responses due by 1/14/2021). IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 [STRICKEN] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #72 MOTION to Dismiss , #70 MOTION to Dismiss , #73 MOTION to Dismiss and for Sanctions by Timothy King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Junttila, Stefanie) Modified on 1/12/2021 (RLou).
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION Court to Take Judicial Notice of Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Filed in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania against Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. re #69 MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' counsel by Robert Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhbit A- Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel filed against Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania) (Paterson, Andrew)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #77 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION for Sanctions , for Disciplinary Action, for Disbarment Referral and for Referral to State Bar Disciplinary Bodies by City of Detroit. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21) (Fink, David)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Support of Motion for Sanctions, for Disciplinary Action, for Disbarment Referral and for Referral to State Bar Disciplinary Bodies by City of Detroit. (Fink, David)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER (Response to the #69 Motion for Sanctions is due by 1/19/2021). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Emergency MOTION to Strike #74 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #69 MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' counsel by Robert Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email Thread and ECF Notification of Filing of Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time) (Paterson, Andrew)
January 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #69 MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' counsel by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Junttila, Stefanie) Modified on 1/5/2021 (RLou).
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #71 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION to Dismiss and for Sanctions by City of Detroit. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Fink, David)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION to Dismiss by Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Eldridge, Scott)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Jocelyn Benson, Michigan Board of State Canvassers, Gretchen Whitmer. (Grill, Erik)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION to Dismiss by Jocelyn Benson, Michigan Board of State Canvassers, Gretchen Whitmer. (Grill, Erik)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' counsel by Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 LETTER from the US Supreme Court that a petition for writ of certiorari was filed on 12/11/2020. [Supreme Court Case Number: 20-815] [Court of Appeals Case Number: 20-2205] (SKra)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Corrected Certificate of Service re #64 Federal Circuit Notice of Appeal,. (SSch)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Julie M Houk appearing on behalf of Michigan State Conference NAACP (Houk, Julie)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Certificate of Service re #64 Federal Circuit Notice of Appeal. (LGra)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 FEDERAL CIRCUIT NOTICE OF APPEAL by All Plaintiffs re #62 Order on Motion for TRO. Receipt No: BMIEDC-8208477 - Fee: $ 505 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Junttila, Stefanie) Modified on 12/10/2020 (SSch). [DOCUMENT IS AN APPEAL TO THE SIXTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS]
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Stefanie Lynn Junttila on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Junttila, Stefanie)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 OPINION and ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' #7 Emergency Motion for Declaratory, Emergency, and Permanent Injunctive Relief. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
December 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #8 Emergency MOTION to Seal , #7 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Declaratory, Emergency, and Permanent Injunctive Relief, pursuant to E.D. Michigan LR 7.1(f) (RLou)
December 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 RESPONSE to #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Supplemental Response by All Plaintiffs. (Rohl, Gregory)
December 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Denying Without Prejudice #59 Emergency Motion for the Court To Take Judicial Notice of Newspaper Articles Published In Detroit Free Press and Associated Press. The Court finds the newspaper articles unnecessary to resolve the pending #7 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Declaratory, Emergency, and Permanent Injunctive Relief. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
December 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The Court is dispensing with oral argument with respect to the #7 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Declaratory, Emergency, and Permanent Injunctive Relief, pursuant to E.D. Michigan LR 7.1(f). IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
December 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Emergency MOTION Court To Take Judicial Notice of Newspaper Articles Published In Detroit Free Press and Associated Press by Robert Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-December 4 2020 Detroit Free Press, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- December 1 2020 AP Article) (Paterson, Andrew)
December 5, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #58 Motion for Leave to File. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief (ECF 57) by Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Response) (Eldridge, Scott)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Rohl, Gregory)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Ezra D Rosenberg on behalf of Michigan State Conference NAACP. (Rosenberg, Ezra)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Amicus Curiae BRIEF by Michigan State Conference NAACP (Driker, Eugene)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Daniel M. Share appearing on behalf of Michigan State Conference NAACP (Share, Daniel)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephen E. Glazek appearing on behalf of Michigan State Conference NAACP (Glazek, Stephen)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Greenbaum on behalf of Michigan State Conference NAACP. (Greenbaum, Jon)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE by Robert Davis of withdrawal of #46 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing, Scheduling and Adjudication of Intervenor Defendant Robert Davis' Emergency Motions to Strike (ECF Nos. 42, 45), #45 Emergency MOTION to Strike #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Paterson, Andrew)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #48 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Amicus curiae shall file the amicus brief today, December 4, 2020. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 REPLY to Response re #8 Emergency MOTION to Seal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Rohl, Gregory)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REPLY to Response re #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Rohl, Gregory)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION Leave to File Amicus Brief , MOTION for Leave to File by Michigan State Conference NAACP. (Driker, Eugene)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Eugene Driker appearing on behalf of Michigan State Conference NAACP (Driker, Eugene)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing, Scheduling and Adjudication of Intervenor Defendant Robert Davis' Emergency Motions to Strike (ECF Nos. 42, 45) by Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Emergency MOTION to Strike #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Robert Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Email from Asst. Attorney General Meingast Advising Counsel for Intervenor Defendant Robert Davis That Written Consent was Not Given to Plaintiffs to file amended complaint #6 ) (Paterson, Andrew)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by All Plaintiffs. (Rohl, Gregory)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Request Seeking Permission to file an Amicus Curiae Brief with (Attachments: #1 Letter Regarding Recommendation, #2 Letter regarding Bronze Star) by Arthur. J. Clemens (ATee)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Amended MOTION to Strike #6 Amended Document,,, Intervenor Defendant Robert Davis' AMENDED/CORRECTED Emergency Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint #6 by Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Emergency MOTION to Strike #6 Amended Document,,, by Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses Intervenor Defendant Robert Davis' Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint #1 by Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #44 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1), Plaintiffs were not required to seek leave of court or permission of the opposing parties prior to filing their Amended Complaint. Intervenor Davis' #41 Motion to Strike and #42 Amended Motion to Strike, are therefore DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Text-Only Order, on Arthur J. Clemens Jr., at 400 N. 4th Street, #1008, St. Louis, MO 63102 (RLou)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The Court does not find the proffered information useful or otherwise necessary to the administration of justice. See United States v. State of Mich., 940 F.2d 143, 165 (6th Cir. 1991). Accordingly, the #43 Request Seeking Permission to File an Amicus Curiae Brief is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RESPONSE to #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by City of Detroit. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12) (Fink, David)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ANSWER to #6 Amended Document,,, Intervenor Defendant Robert Davis' Answer to Plaintiffs' Purported First-Amended Complaint #6 by Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RESPONSE to #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RESPONSE to #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit) (Eldridge, Scott)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RESPONSE to #8 Emergency MOTION to Seal filed by Jocelyn Benson, Michigan Board of State Canvassers, Gretchen Whitmer. (Meingast, Heather)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RESPONSE to #8 Emergency MOTION to Seal filed by City of Detroit. (Fink, David)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jocelyn Benson, Michigan Board of State Canvassers, Gretchen Whitmer. (Meingast, Heather)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE to #8 Emergency MOTION to Seal filed by Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party. (Eldridge, Scott)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE to #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jocelyn Benson, Michigan Board of State Canvassers, Gretchen Whitmer. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1. Constantino v City of Detroit Wayne Circuit 20-014780-AW Affidavit of Christopher Thomas, #3 Exhibit 2. Affidavit of Jonathan Brater, #4 Exhibit 3. Draft minutes 11.23.2020, #5 Exhibit 4. Electors Transmittal, #6 Exhibit 5. MRP Electors, #7 Exhibit 6. Johnson v Benson, et al MI Sup Ct 162286 Petition, #8 Exhibit 7. Bailey v Antrim Co Antrim Circuit 20-9238-CZ Complaint, #9 Exhibit 8. Trump v Benson Court of Claims 20-000225-MZ Complaint, #10 Exhibit 9. Trump v Benson Court of Claims 20-000225-MZ Order, #11 Exhibit 10. Trump v Benson Court of Appeals 355378 Brief, #12 Exhibit 11. Stoddard v City of Detroit, et al Wayne Circuit 20-014604-CZ Complaint, #13 Exhibit 12. Stoddard v City of Detroit, et al Wayne Circuit 20-014604-CZ Order, #14 Exhibit 13. Constantino v City of Detroit, et al Wayne Circuit 20-01780-AW Complaint, #15 Exhibit 14. Constantino v City of Detroit, et al Wayne Circuit 20-014780-AW Order, #16 Exhibit 15. Constantino MI Sup Ct 162245 Order) (Meingast, Heather)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in City of Detroit's Brief in Response to Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Declaratory, Emergency, and Permanent Injunctive Relief by City of Detroit. (Fink, David)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONSE to #8 Emergency MOTION to Seal filed by Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 OPINION and ORDER Granting #5 #12 #14 Motions to Intervene. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 APPLICATION (Ex Parte) to Extend Page Limits by Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party. (Eldridge, Scott)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY to Response re #12 Emergency MOTION to Intervene as Defendant filed by Robert Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Email Chain between Plaintiffs' Counsel and Counsel for Intervenor Defendant Robert Davis Granting Concurrence) (Paterson, Andrew)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Intervene as a Defendant, #12 Emergency MOTION to Intervene as Defendant, #14 MOTION to Intervene filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rohl, Gregory)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #30 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #27 Application to Extend Page Limits. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #33 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Re: Briefing Schedule. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Erik A. Grill appearing on behalf of Jocelyn Benson, Michigan Board of State Canvassers, Gretchen Whitmer (Grill, Erik)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Heather S. Meingast appearing on behalf of Jocelyn Benson, Michigan Board of State Canvassers, Gretchen Whitmer (Meingast, Heather)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Rohl, Gregory)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 EXHIBIT Exhibit A- Email Correspondence between Counsel for Plaintiffs and Counsel for Proposed Intervenor Defendant Robert Davis Granting Concurrence for Intervention re #17 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing, Scheduling and Adjudication of Proposed Intervenor Defendant Robert Davis' Emergency Motion to Intervene (ECF No. 12)., #12 Emergency MOTION to Intervene as Defendant by Robert Davis (Paterson, Andrew)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mary Ellen Gurewitz appearing on behalf of Michigan Democratic Party (Gurewitz, Mary Ellen)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mary Ellen Gurewitz appearing on behalf of Democratic National Committee (Gurewitz, Mary Ellen)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing, Scheduling and Adjudication of Proposed Intervenor Defendant Robert Davis' Emergency Motion to Intervene (ECF No. 12). by Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Responses, if any, to the #5 #12 #14 Motions to Intervene, shall be filed no later than 9:00 AM on Wednesday, December 2, 2020. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Once proper service has been effectuated, Plaintiff shall immediately notify the Court, in writing, and provide information by which the Court may contact opposing counsel to schedule a status conference.If proper service is not effectuated by 5:00 PM today, Plaintiffs shall notify the Court, in writing by 5:30 PM today, regarding the status of serving Defendants. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew A. Paterson, Jr on behalf of Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Intervene by Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Jaffe Affidavit, #3 Exhibit MacKenzie Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Zimmerman Affidavit, #5 Exhibit Complaint, #6 Exhibit Order, #7 Exhibit Appeal Motion, #8 Exhibit Appellate Docket, #9 Exhibit Order, #10 Exhibit Order, #11 Exhibit Order, #12 Exhibit Order, #13 Exhibit Order, #14 Exhibit Order, #15 Exhibit Petition, #16 Exhibit Amended Complaint) (Eldridge, Scott)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott R. Eldridge on behalf of Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party. (Eldridge, Scott)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Emergency MOTION to Intervene as Defendant by Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 [STRICKEN] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs (Rohl, Gregory) Modified on 11/30/2020 (LGra).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 [STRICKEN] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs (Rohl, Gregory) Modified on 11/30/2020 (LGra).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 [STRICKEN] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs (Rohl, Gregory) Modified on 11/30/2020 (LGra).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Error directed to: Gregory J. Rohl re #9 Certificate of Service. Wrong or incomplete PDF image was uploaded. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (LGra)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Error directed to: Gregory J. Rohl re #11 Certificate of Service. Wrong or incomplete PDF image was uploaded. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (LGra)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Error directed to: Gregory J. Rohl re #10 Certificate of Service. Wrong or incomplete PDF image was uploaded. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (LGra)
November 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Emergency MOTION to Seal by All Plaintiffs. (Rohl, Gregory)
November 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by All Plaintiffs. (Rohl, Gregory)
November 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 [DOCUMENT IS TITLED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT] AMENDED by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 101, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 102, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 103, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 104, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 105, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 106, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 107, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 108, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 110, #30 Exhibit Exhibit 111) (Rohl, Gregory) Modified on 11/30/2020 (LGra).
November 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Intervene as a Defendant by City of Detroit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Fink, David)
November 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan J. Fink on behalf of City of Detroit. (Fink, Nathan)
November 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl Bressack on behalf of City of Detroit. (Bressack, Darryl)
November 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Fink on behalf of City of Detroit. (Fink, David)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8187034 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 101, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 102, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 103, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 104, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 105, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 106, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 107, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 108, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 109) (Rohl, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al v. Whitmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daren Rubingh
Represented By: Gregory J. Rohl
Represented By: Stefanie Lynn Junttila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Ritchard
Represented By: Gregory J. Rohl
Represented By: Stefanie Lynn Junttila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy King
Represented By: Gregory J. Rohl
Represented By: Stefanie Lynn Junttila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hooper
Represented By: Gregory J. Rohl
Represented By: Stefanie Lynn Junttila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Haggard
Represented By: Gregory J. Rohl
Represented By: Stefanie Lynn Junttila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Sheridan
Represented By: Gregory J. Rohl
Represented By: Stefanie Lynn Junttila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Board of State Canvassers
Represented By: Erik A. Grill
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jocelyn Benson
Represented By: Erik A. Grill
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Represented By: Erik A. Grill
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Democratic National Committee
Represented By: Mary Ellen Gurewitz
Represented By: Scott R. Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: City of Detroit
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Nathan J. Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Michigan Democratic Party
Represented By: Mary Ellen Gurewitz
Represented By: Scott R. Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Robert Davis
Represented By: Stefanie Lynn Junttila
Represented By: Andrew A. Paterson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michigan State Conference NAACP
Represented By: Julie M Houk
Represented By: Jon Greenbaum
Represented By: Eugene Driker
Represented By: Daniel M. Share
Represented By: Stephen E. Glazek
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?