Protective Life Insurance Company v. Patel et al
Plaintiff: Protective Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Sanjay Patel, Asha Taylor, Dhaval Taylor, Kirit Patel and Shakri Patel
Case Number: 2:2020cv13289
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: David M Lawson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Kirit Patel, Sanjay Patel, Shakri Patel. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (Vrana, Mark)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Shakri Patel waiver sent on 1/15/2021, answer due 3/16/2021. (Markel, Alexandra)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued for *Shakri Patel* (SOso)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Protective Life Insurance Company against All Defendants. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10) (Czapski, Michelle)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order REQUEST for SUMMONS for Shakri Patel. (Czapski, Michelle)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Sanjay Patel waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/16/2021. (Markel, Alexandra)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Kirit Patel waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/16/2021. (Markel, Alexandra)
January 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Asha Taylor, Dhaval Taylor. (Behan, Michael)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis in Flint to District Judge David M. Lawson in Detroit. (NAhm)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra C. Markel on behalf of Protective Life Insurance Company. (Markel, Alexandra)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Protective Life Insurance Company (Czapski, Michelle)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (SOso)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Protective Life Insurance Company against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8217675 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Out of State - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Federal Kemper Policy, #3 Exhibit 2 - June 15, 2001 Beneficiary Change Request, #4 Exhibit 3 - July 20, 2015 Benefciary Change Request, #5 Exhibit 4 - Empire General Policy, #6 Exhibit 5 - February 17, 2011 Beneficiary Change Request, #7 Exhibit 6 - Protective February 23, 2011 Correspondence, #8 Exhibit 7 - Dhaval Taylor's November 5, 2020 Claim Correspondence, #9 Exhibit 8 - Asha Taylor's November 5, 2020 Claim Correspondence, #10 Exhibit 9 - Asha Taylor and Dhaval Taylor's November 12, 2020 Claim Correspondence, #11 Exhibit 10 - Attorney Kavanaugh's November 16, 2020 Correspondence) (Czapski, Michelle)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Protective Life Insurance Company v. Patel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Protective Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Michelle Thurber Czapski
Represented By: Alexandra C. Markel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanjay Patel
Represented By: Mark Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asha Taylor
Represented By: Michael R. Behan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dhaval Taylor
Represented By: Michael R. Behan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirit Patel
Represented By: Mark Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shakri Patel
Represented By: Mark Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?