Breeze Smoke LLC v. Jarjess et al
Plaintiff: Breeze Smoke LLC
Defendant: John Doe 3, Ghazwan Eeso, EZ Smoke Shop 2, Inc., Detroit Wholesale, Mohasen Moslh, Reval Distributor, 94 & Haggerty, Inc., John Doe 8, EZ Smoke Shop, Inc., Sharf Hauter, Reval Hakeem, Ismail Kaid Al-Madrahi, John Doe 10, Riyadh Jaffo Hakeem, Luqman Abro, John Doe 9, Mohamed Qasem, John Doe 6, L Abro Distributor LLC, Rivian Eeso, 32271 Ford Rd., LLC, 94 & Zeeb, Inc., Fouad Aljalal, John Doe 5, Bilal Mohamed Ali, White Star Distribution, Inc., John Doe 7, Hussein Ayyad, Abdel Berry, Malek Distribution, Inc., Solaiman Mini Mart, LLC, Fuad Mugali, Bilal Saad, John Doe 1, Twafig Haidara, John Doe 2, L and R Wholesale LLC, John Doe 4, EZ Smoke Shop Plus, Inc., Farid Jarjess and Isso Petroleum, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv13413
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Referring Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Filing 71 STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION Against Certain Defendants. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATED ORDER Dismissing EZ Smoke Shop Plus, Inc., Ismail Kaid Al-Madrahi, Malek Distribution, Inc., Fuad Mugali, Bilal Mohamed Ali and EZ Smoke Shop 2, Inc. With Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
May 20, 2021 Filing 69 STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION Against Defendants EZ Smoke Shop 2, Inc., Ismail Kaid Al-Madrahi, EZ Smoke Shop Plus, Bilal Mohamed Ali, Malek Distribution, Inc., and Fuad Mugali. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
April 13, 2021 Filing 68 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Isso Petroleum, Inc. (Becker, Frank)
April 13, 2021 Filing 67 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Isso Petroleum, Inc.. (Becker, Frank)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER and Preliminary Injunction as to Isso Petroleum, Inc. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #60 Ex Parte MOTION TO EXTEND Time to Serve Defendants Detroit Wholesale and Hussein Ayyad to May 31, 2021 filed by Breeze Smoke LLC. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Waive Answers to the Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 10/1/2021, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 12/14/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/22/2022 03:00 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (Refer to image for additional dates) (MLan)
March 30, 2021 Filing 62 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Farid Jarjess, Twafig Haidara, Mohamed Qasem, Solaiman Mini Mart, LLC, White Star Distribution, Inc.* (DAll)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #54 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Breeze Smoke LLC. and finding as Moot #40 MOTION to Dismiss filed by 32271 Ford Rd., LLC, Bilal Saad. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
March 30, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow: Scheduling Conference held on 3/30/2021. (MLan)
March 29, 2021 Filing 61 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Farid Jarjess, Twafig Haidara, Mohamed Qasem, Solaiman Mini Mart, LLC, White Star Distribution, Inc. by Breeze Smoke LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Declaration of Andrew M. Pauwels, Attorney) (Burandt, Nicholas)
March 29, 2021 Filing 60 Ex Parte MOTION TO EXTEND Time to Serve Defendants Detroit Wholesale and Hussein Ayyad re #5 Summons Issued by Breeze Smoke LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Randy Hughey, Process Server) (Burandt, Nicholas)
March 29, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Breeze Smoke LLC as to Abdel Berry, Sharf Hauter, Mohasen Moslh, 94 & Haggerty, Inc. and 94 & Zeeb, Inc. (Burandt, Nicholas)
March 29, 2021 Filing 58 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Pauwels, Andrew)
March 26, 2021 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Isso Petroleum, Inc. served on 3/23/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (Pauwels, Andrew)
March 12, 2021 Filing 56 SUMMONS Issued for *Isso Petroleum, Inc.* (NAhm)
March 11, 2021 Filing 55 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Breeze Smoke LLC against Farid Jarjess, 94 & Haggerty, Inc., 94 & Zeeb, Inc., Luqman Abro, Bilal Mohamed Ali, Hussein Ayyad, Abdel Berry, Detroit Wholesale, EZ Smoke Shop 2, Inc., EZ Smoke Shop Plus, Inc., Ghazwan Eeso, Rivian Eeso, Twafig Haidara, Reval Hakeem, Riyadh Jaffo Hakeem, Sharf Hauter, Ismail Kaid Al-Madrahi, L Abro Distributor LLC, L and R Wholesale LLC, Malek Distribution, Inc., Mohasen Moslh, Fuad Mugali, Mohamed Qasem, Reval Distributor, Solaiman Mini Mart, LLC, White Star Distribution, Inc., Isso Petroleum, Inc.. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A- TESS Page for U.S. Trademark Application No.90/012,117 for BREEZE SMOKE, #3 Exhibit B- TESS Page for U.S. Trademark Application No. 90/246,820 for BREEZE PLUS, #4 Exhibit C- Examples of Defendants' counterfeit products and infringement, #5 Exhibit D- Cease and desist letters sent from Breeze Smoke to several Defendants) (Hyde, Mary)
March 11, 2021 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Isso Petroleum, Inc.. (Hyde, Mary)
March 8, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Breeze Smoke LLC as to EZ Smoke Shop, Inc., Bilal Saad, 32271 Ford Rd., LLC and Fouad Aljalal (Burandt, Nicholas)
February 23, 2021 Filing 53 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/30/2021 11:00 AM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. Counsel will receive Zoom invitation by email. (MLan)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER and PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
February 22, 2021 Filing 51 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by 32271 Ford Rd., LLC, Bilal Saad identifying Corporate Parent Bilal Saad for 32271 Ford Rd., LLC, Bilal Saad. (Nicols, Matthew)
February 18, 2021 Filing 50 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Ghazwan Eeso, Rivian Eeso. (Becker, Frank)
February 18, 2021 Filing 49 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by EZ Smoke Shop Plus, Inc. (Corbin, Kim)
February 18, 2021 Filing 48 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by EZ Smoke Shop 2, Inc. (Corbin, Kim)
February 18, 2021 Filing 47 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Malek Distribution, Inc. (Corbin, Kim)
February 18, 2021 Filing 46 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Malek Distribution, Inc., Fuad Mugali. (Corbin, Kim)
February 18, 2021 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by EZ Smoke Shop 2, Inc., Ismail Kaid Al-Madrahi. (Corbin, Kim)
February 18, 2021 Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Bilal Mohamed Ali, EZ Smoke Shop Plus, Inc.. (Corbin, Kim)
February 18, 2021 Filing 43 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by L and R Wholesale LLC (Cunningham, Thomas)
February 18, 2021 Filing 42 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by L Abro Distributor LLC (Cunningham, Thomas)
February 18, 2021 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Luqman Abro, Reval Hakeem, Riyadh Jaffo Hakeem, L Abro Distributor LLC, L and R Wholesale LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas)
February 18, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss by 32271 Ford Rd., LLC, Bilal Saad. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (Nicols, Matthew)
February 17, 2021 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. White Star Distribution, Inc. served on 2/17/2021, answer due 3/10/2021. (Lamb, Jeffrey)
February 17, 2021 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Mohamed Qasem served on 2/17/2021, answer due 3/10/2021. (Lamb, Jeffrey)
February 9, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank G. Becker on behalf of Ghazwan Eeso, Rivian Eeso. (Becker, Frank)
February 4, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Kim D. Corbin on behalf of Bilal Mohamed Ali, EZ Smoke Shop 2, Inc., EZ Smoke Shop Plus, Inc., Ismail Kaid Al-Madrahi, Malek Distribution, Inc., Fuad Mugali. (Corbin, Kim)
January 29, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Chanille Carswell on behalf of Luqman Abro, Reval Hakeem, Riyadh Jaffo Hakeem, L Abro Distributor LLC, L and R Wholesale LLC. (Carswell, Chanille)
January 29, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Cunningham on behalf of Luqman Abro, Reval Hakeem, Riyadh Jaffo Hakeem, L Abro Distributor LLC, L and R Wholesale LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas)
January 28, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Burandt on behalf of Breeze Smoke LLC. (Burandt, Nicholas)
January 28, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 1/28/2021 03:00 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. Counsel to receive Zoom invitation by email. (MLan)
January 28, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow: Status Conference held on 1/28/2021. Responses to #1 Complaint due by 2/18/2021. (MLan)
January 27, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T. Nicols on behalf of 32271 Ford Rd., LLC, Bilal Saad. (Nicols, Matthew)
January 27, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall A. Pentiuk on behalf of 32271 Ford Rd., LLC, Bilal Saad. (Pentiuk, Randall)
January 19, 2021 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. L Abro Distributor LLC served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Lamb, Jeffrey)
January 19, 2021 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Luqman Abro served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Lamb, Jeffrey)
January 19, 2021 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Reval Distributor served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Lamb, Jeffrey)
January 19, 2021 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Riyadh Jaffo Hakeem served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Lamb, Jeffrey)
January 19, 2021 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. L and R Wholesale LLC served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Lamb, Jeffrey)
January 19, 2021 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Reval Hakeem served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Lamb, Jeffrey)
January 19, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Solaiman Mini Mart, LLC served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Lamb, Jeffrey)
January 19, 2021 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Twafig Haidara served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Lamb, Jeffrey)
January 19, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. EZ Smoke Shop Plus, Inc. served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Lamb, Jeffrey)
January 19, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Bilal Mohamed Ali served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Lamb, Jeffrey)
January 19, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Rivian Eeso served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Lamb, Jeffrey)
January 19, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ghazwan Eeso served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Lamb, Jeffrey)
January 19, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Farid Jarjess served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Lamb, Jeffrey)
January 19, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. EZ Smoke Shop 2, Inc. served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Pauwels, Andrew)
January 19, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ismail Kaid Al-Madrahi served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Pauwels, Andrew)
January 19, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Malek Distribution, Inc. served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Pauwels, Andrew)
January 19, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Fuad Mugali served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Pauwels, Andrew)
January 19, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. EZ Smoke Shop, Inc. served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Pauwels, Andrew)
January 19, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Fouad Aljalal served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Lamb, Jeffrey)
January 19, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Bilal Saad served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Lamb, Jeffrey)
January 19, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. 32271 Ford Rd., LLC served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. (Lamb, Jeffrey)
January 7, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Memorandum in Support of Breeze Smoke's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Breeze Smoke LLC (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Declarations and Exhibits to Breeze Smoke's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Steven Haddad, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Mary Hyde, #4 Exhibit A - TESS Page for U.S. Trademark Application No. 90/012,117 for BREEZE SMOKE, #5 Exhibit B - TESS Page for U.S. Trademark Application No. 90/246,820 for BREEZE PLUS, #6 Exhibit C - Examples displaying Defendants infringing uses of the BREEZE Marks and BREEZE Trade Dress, #7 Exhibit D - Letters sent to several Defendants requesting them to cease and desist their unlawful infringement, #8 Exhibit E - Screenshots from various websites showing positive reviews of the BREEZE disposable vaping pens, #9 Exhibit F - Screenshot of the definition of the word breeze taken from Merriam-Webster online dictionary, #10 Exhibit G - October 14, 2020 Notice of Publication for U.S. Trademark Application No. 90/012,117 for BREEZE SMOKE, #11 Exhibit H - Screenshot of TSDR documents for U.S. Trademark Application No. 90/012,117 for BREEZE SMOKE as of December 18, 2020) (Hyde, Mary)
January 7, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Breeze Smoke LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Hyde, Mary)
January 4, 2021 Filing 6 Trademark Report Sent To Washington (Pauwels, Andrew)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
January 4, 2021 NOTICE of Error directed to: Andrew M. Pauwels. Form AO 120 is missing. The filing attorney must file the form found on www.uscourts.gov with the Court to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SSch)
January 4, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Alexander Hyde on behalf of Breeze Smoke LLC. (Hyde, Mary)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey K. Lamb on behalf of Breeze Smoke LLC. (Lamb, Jeffrey)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Breeze Smoke LLC (Pauwels, Andrew)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Breeze Smoke LLC against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8247283 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - TESS Page for U.S. Trademark Application No. 90/012,117 for BREEZE SMOKE, #3 Exhibit B - TESS Page for U.S. Trademark Application No. 90/246,820 for BREEZE PLUS, #4 Exhibit C - Examples of Defendants counterfeit products and infringement, #5 Exhibit D - Cease and desist letters sent from Breeze Smoke to several Defendants) (Pauwels, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breeze Smoke LLC v. Jarjess et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ghazwan Eeso
Represented By: Frank G. Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EZ Smoke Shop 2, Inc.
Represented By: Kim D. Corbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit Wholesale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohasen Moslh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reval Distributor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 94 & Haggerty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EZ Smoke Shop, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharf Hauter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reval Hakeem
Represented By: Thomas W. Cunningham
Represented By: Chanille Carswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ismail Kaid Al-Madrahi
Represented By: Kim D. Corbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riyadh Jaffo Hakeem
Represented By: Thomas W. Cunningham
Represented By: Chanille Carswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luqman Abro
Represented By: Thomas W. Cunningham
Represented By: Chanille Carswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohamed Qasem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Abro Distributor LLC
Represented By: Thomas W. Cunningham
Represented By: Chanille Carswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rivian Eeso
Represented By: Frank G. Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 32271 Ford Rd., LLC
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Represented By: Matthew T. Nicols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 94 & Zeeb, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fouad Aljalal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bilal Mohamed Ali
Represented By: Kim D. Corbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Star Distribution, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hussein Ayyad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdel Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malek Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: Kim D. Corbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solaiman Mini Mart, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fuad Mugali
Represented By: Kim D. Corbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bilal Saad
Represented By: Randall A. Pentiuk
Represented By: Matthew T. Nicols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twafig Haidara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L and R Wholesale LLC
Represented By: Thomas W. Cunningham
Represented By: Chanille Carswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EZ Smoke Shop Plus, Inc.
Represented By: Kim D. Corbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farid Jarjess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isso Petroleum, Inc.
Represented By: Frank G. Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breeze Smoke LLC
Represented By: Mary Alexander Hyde
Represented By: Andrew M. Pauwels
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Lamb
Represented By: Nicholas Burandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?