Johnson v. DTE Energy Corporate Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Dwight Johnson
Defendant: DTE Energy Corporate Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv13415
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Robert H Cleland
2 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by DTE Energy Corporate Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent DTE Energy Company for DTE Energy Corporate Services, LLC. (Veldhuis, Blaine)
January 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Blaine Andrew Veldhuis on behalf of DTE Energy Corporate Services, LLC. (Veldhuis, Blaine)
January 5, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. DTE Energy Corporate Services, LLC waiver sent on 1/5/2021, answer due 3/8/2021. (Veldhuis, Blaine)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER RE DISQUALIFICATION OF JUDGE AND REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Robert H. Cleland in Port Huron to District Judge Terrence G. Berg in Detroit. (NAhm)
January 4, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DTE Energy Corporate Services, LLC from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 20-015491-CD. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8248187 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Excerpts from Collective Bargaining Agreement, #4 Exhibit C - Wage and Hour Determination) (Buckley-Norwood, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. DTE Energy Corporate Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Johnson
Represented By: Danielle B. Safran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DTE Energy Corporate Services, LLC
Represented By: Tiffany A. Buckley-Norwood
Represented By: Blaine Andrew Veldhuis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?