Saba v. Silverback Moving, Inc. d/b/a Schea Van Lines, et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Saba
Defendant: Silverback Moving, Inc. d/b/a Schea Van Lines,, Morse Moving & Storage, Inc., Allied Van Lines, Inc. and Morse Moving & Storage Real Estate Holding Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv10272
Filed: February 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Terrence G Berg
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 81
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Morse Moving & Storage Real Estate Holding Company, Morse Moving & Storage, Inc.. (Hubbard, Emileigh)
March 31, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Allied Van Lines, Inc.. (Hubbard, Emileigh)
March 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/14/2021 10:30 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu)
March 19, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Silverback Moving, Inc. d/b/a Schea Van Lines,. (Eads, John)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Dismiss State Law Claims Against Defendants Allied Van Lines, Inc., Morse Moving and Storage, Inc., and Morse Moving and Storage Real Estate Holding Company, Only. Motions terminated: #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Morse Moving & Storage Real Estate Holding Company, Morse Moving & Storage, Inc., Allied Van Lines, Inc. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
March 17, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John T. Eads, III appearing on behalf of Silverback Moving, Inc. d/b/a Schea Van Lines, (Eads, John)
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs on Defendant Silverback d/b/a Schea Van Lines (Thompson, Kevin)
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Vic Houston Henry, I appearing on behalf of Allied Van Lines, Inc., Morse Moving & Storage Real Estate Holding Company, Morse Moving & Storage, Inc. (Henry, Vic)
February 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Michael Thompson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Thompson, Kevin)
February 17, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #4 MOTION to Dismiss (AChu)
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Allied Van Lines, Inc., Morse Moving & Storage Real Estate Holding Company, Morse Moving & Storage, Inc.. (Hubbard, Emileigh)
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick R. Damm on behalf of Allied Van Lines, Inc., Morse Moving & Storage Real Estate Holding Company, Morse Moving & Storage, Inc.. (Damm, Frederick)
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Allied Van Lines, Inc., Morse Moving & Storage Real Estate Holding Company, Morse Moving & Storage, Inc. (Henry, Vic)
February 8, 2021 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendant Morse Moving & Storage Real Estate Holding Company. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #1 Notice of Removal, (Hubbard, Emileigh)
February 8, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
February 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Morse Moving & Storage, Inc., Allied Van Lines, Inc. from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 20-016363-NZ. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8320332 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Index of Documents Filed in State Court, #2 Exhibit 1A - Plaintiff's Original Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1B - Summons) (Hubbard, Emileigh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saba v. Silverback Moving, Inc. d/b/a Schea Van Lines, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Saba
Represented By: Kevin Michael Thompson
Represented By: Stephen M. Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silverback Moving, Inc. d/b/a Schea Van Lines,
Represented By: John T. Eads, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morse Moving & Storage, Inc.
Represented By: Emileigh Hubbard
Represented By: Vic Houston Henry, I
Represented By: Frederick R. Damm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Van Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Emileigh Hubbard
Represented By: Vic Houston Henry, I
Represented By: Frederick R. Damm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morse Moving & Storage Real Estate Holding Company
Represented By: Emileigh Hubbard
Represented By: Vic Houston Henry, I
Represented By: Frederick R. Damm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?