Trutek Corp. v. BlueWillow Biologics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Trutek Corp.
Defendant: BlueWillow Biologics, Inc., Robin Roe 1 Through 10 and ABC Corporation 1 though 10
Case Number: 2:2021cv10312
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Deadline to Respond to #1 Complaint, (Response due by 5/5/2021). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Patent Report Sent To Washington (SSch)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to #1 Complaint, (Response due by 4/5/2021). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Ellis on behalf of BlueWillow Biologics, Inc.. (Ellis, Nicholas)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Error directed to: Stanley H Kremen. Form AO 120 is missing. The filing attorney must file the form found on www.uscourts.gov with the Court to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SSch)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Trutek Corp. (Kremen, Stanley)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendants Robin Roe 1 Through 10, ABC Corporation 1 though 10. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #1 Complaint,,, (Altman, Keith)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *BlueWillow Biologics, Inc.* (DAll)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Trutek Corp. against BlueWillow Biologics, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8327903 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Somerset County, New Jersey - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw County, Michigan. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Document Continuation JS44 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Document Continuation Summons, #9 Document Continuation USPTO Form AO 120) (Kremen, Stanley)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Error directed to: Stanley H Kremen re #1 Complaint,,,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DAll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trutek Corp. v. BlueWillow Biologics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trutek Corp.
Represented By: Stanley H Kremen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlueWillow Biologics, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas J. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Roe 1 Through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporation 1 though 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?