Doe v. Eastern Michigan University Board of Regents et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 10, Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 8, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 9, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 7, Jane Doe 11, Jane Doe 4 and Jane Doe 6
Defendant: Delta Tau Delta Theta XI Chapter, Eastern Michigan University Board of Regents, Alpha Sigma Phi Fraternity, INC, Melody Werner, Eastern Michigan University Police Department, Daniel Karrick, Delta Tau Delta, Inc, Robert Heighes and Alpha Sigma Phi Gamma Upsilon Chapter
Case Number: 2:2021cv10649
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Robert Heighes, Daniel Karrick, Melody Werner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unpublished Cases) (Richards, Joshua)
May 19, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Eastern Michigan University Board of Regents, Eastern Michigan University Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Exhibit Concerning Jane Doe 1, #3 Exhibit 2 - Exhibit Concerning Jane Doe 6, #4 Exhibit 3 - Exhibit Concerning Jane Doe 7, #5 Exhibit 4 - Exhibit Concerning Jane Doe 7, #6 Exhibit 5 - Exhibit Concerning Jane Doe 7, #7 Exhibit 6 - Exhibit Concerning Jane Doe 11, #8 Exhibit 7 - Exhibit Concerning Jane Doe 11, #9 Exhibit 8 - Exhibit Concerning Jane Doe 11, #10 Exhibit 9 - Exhibit Concerning Jane Doe 11) (Richards, Joshua)
May 19, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Bridgitte Elizabeth Mott on behalf of Eastern Michigan University Board of Regents, Eastern Michigan University Police Department, Robert Heighes, Daniel Karrick, Melody Werner. (Mott, Bridgitte)
May 19, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaskiran Kaur Samra on behalf of Alpha Sigma Phi Fraternity, INC. (Samra, Jaskiran)
May 19, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Osborne on behalf of Alpha Sigma Phi Fraternity, INC. (Osborne, Michael)
May 18, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua I. Arnkoff on behalf of Alpha Sigma Phi Fraternity, INC. (Arnkoff, Joshua)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFFS TO PROCEED PSEUDONYMOUSLY. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
May 17, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Delta Tau Delta, Inc served on 5/3/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Flood, Todd)
May 17, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Alpha Sigma Phi Gamma Upsilon Chapter served on 5/3/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Flood, Todd)
May 17, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Alpha Sigma Phi Fraternity, INC served on 5/7/2021, answer due 5/28/2021. (Flood, Todd)
May 17, 2021 NOTICE of Error directed to: Joshua I. Arnkoff re 15 Answer to Complaint. Wrong or incomplete PDF image was uploaded. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (TTho)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATED ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFFS TO PROCEED PSEUDONYMOUSLY. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
April 28, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Weaver on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Weaver, Michael)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFFS TO PROCEED PSEUDONYMOUSLY Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
April 23, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Robert Heighes served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. (Flood, Todd)
April 23, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Eastern Michigan University Board of Regents served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. (Flood, Todd)
April 23, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Eastern Michigan University Police Department served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. (Flood, Todd)
April 23, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Delta Tau Delta Theta XI Chapter served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. (Flood, Todd)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint.. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
April 20, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Eastern Michigan University Board of Regents, Eastern Michigan University Police Department, Robert Heighes, Daniel Karrick, Melody Werner. (Richards, Joshua)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Daniel Karrick served on 4/17/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Flood, Todd)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Melody Werner served on 4/17/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Flood, Todd)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua W.B. Richards on behalf of Eastern Michigan University Board of Regents, Eastern Michigan University Police Department, Robert Heighes, Daniel Karrick, Melody Werner. (Richards, Joshua)
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Alpha Sigma Phi Fraternity, INC, Alpha Sigma Phi Gamma Upsilon Chapter, Delta Tau Delta Theta XI Chapter, Delta Tau Delta, Inc, Eastern Michigan University Board of Regents, Eastern Michigan University Police Department, Robert Heighes, Daniel Karrick, Melody Werner* (TTho)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8399620 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Flood, Todd)
March 24, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)
March 24, 2021 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Jane Doe 7, Jane Doe 8, Jane Doe 9, Jane Doe 10, Jane Doe 11. Reason: Add plaintiffs. Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Flood, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Eastern Michigan University Board of Regents et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Tau Delta Theta XI Chapter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Michigan University Board of Regents
Represented By: Bridgitte Elizabeth Mott
Represented By: Joshua W.B. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Sigma Phi Fraternity, INC
Represented By: Joshua I. Arnkoff
Represented By: Michael Osborne
Represented By: Jaskiran Kaur Samra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melody Werner
Represented By: Bridgitte Elizabeth Mott
Represented By: Joshua W.B. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Michigan University Police Department
Represented By: Bridgitte Elizabeth Mott
Represented By: Joshua W.B. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Karrick
Represented By: Bridgitte Elizabeth Mott
Represented By: Joshua W.B. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Tau Delta, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Heighes
Represented By: Bridgitte Elizabeth Mott
Represented By: Joshua W.B. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Sigma Phi Gamma Upsilon Chapter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 10
Represented By: Todd F. Flood
Represented By: Michael D. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1
Represented By: Todd F. Flood
Represented By: Michael D. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 8
Represented By: Todd F. Flood
Represented By: Michael D. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 3
Represented By: Todd F. Flood
Represented By: Michael D. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 9
Represented By: Todd F. Flood
Represented By: Michael D. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 2
Represented By: Todd F. Flood
Represented By: Michael D. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 5
Represented By: Todd F. Flood
Represented By: Michael D. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 7
Represented By: Todd F. Flood
Represented By: Michael D. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 11
Represented By: Todd F. Flood
Represented By: Michael D. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 4
Represented By: Todd F. Flood
Represented By: Michael D. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 6
Represented By: Todd F. Flood
Represented By: Michael D. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?